Strong et al v. Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Apollo Strong, Charles Stuart, Ashley Stuart and Amber Hart
Defendant: Tripp Brightwell, James Stewart, Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC, Charles Feldman Investment Group, LLC and Daniel Wade Shebesta
Case Number: 1:2018cv00634
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Stuart, Amber Hart, Apollo Strong, Charles Stuart. James Stewart served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Norton, Nathaniel)
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint by Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC. (Stoker, M.)
September 11, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to James Stewart, Tripp Brightwell. (lt)
September 11, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Amber Hart, Apollo Strong, Ashley Stuart, Charles Stuart. James Stewart and Tripp Brightwell (Norton, Nathaniel)
August 30, 2018 Reset Deadline: Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC answer due 9/17/2018. (lt)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The response to the complaint is due on or before September 17, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rg)
August 29, 2018 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stoker, M.)
August 15, 2018 Notice of Correction: re 11 Order. Please disregard. Filed in error. (lt)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Stuart, Amber Hart, Apollo Strong, Charles Stuart. Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/3/2018. (Norton, Nathaniel)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC. (lt)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Amber Hart, Apollo Strong, Ashley Stuart, Charles Stuart. Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC d/b/a Marathon RMG, LLC (Norton, Nathaniel)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Stuart, Amber Hart, Apollo Strong, Charles Stuart. Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018. (Norton, Nathaniel)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Daniel Wade Shebesta. (lt)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Amber Hart, Apollo Strong, Ashley Stuart, Charles Stuart. Daniel Wade Shebesta a/k/a Daniel Wade (Norton, Nathaniel)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charles Feldman Investment Group, LLC, Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC. (cj)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Amber Hart, Apollo Strong, Ashley Stuart, Charles Stuart. Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC and Charles Feldman Investment Group, LLC (Norton, Nathaniel)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Amber Hart, Apollo Strong, Ashley Stuart, Charles Stuart. (Norton, Nathaniel)
July 27, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11058711). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Ashley Stuart, Amber Hart, Apollo Strong, Charles Stuart.(Norton, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong et al v. Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apollo Strong
Represented By: Nathaniel Cartwright Norton
Represented By: Lakshmi Ramakrishnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Stuart
Represented By: Nathaniel Cartwright Norton
Represented By: Lakshmi Ramakrishnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Stuart
Represented By: Nathaniel Cartwright Norton
Represented By: Lakshmi Ramakrishnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Hart
Represented By: Nathaniel Cartwright Norton
Represented By: Lakshmi Ramakrishnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tripp Brightwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Resource Management Group, LLC
Represented By: M. Wilson Stoker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Feldman Investment Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wade Shebesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?