United States of America v. Olenick et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Counter Plaintiff: M. Rae Nadler-Olenick and Walter Olenick
Case Number: 1:2018cv00675
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 47:0151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America, filed by M. Rae Nadler-Olenick, Walter Olenick.(dm)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by United States of America, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Walter Olenick, Defendant M. Rae Nadler-Olenick (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gary)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 12 MOTIONS by M. Rae Nadler-Olenick, Walter Olenick. (dm)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. M. Rae Nadler-Olenick served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Wright, Gary)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Walter Olenick served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Wright, Gary)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 Letter/Correspondence from M. Rae Nadler-Olenick, Walter Olenick. (dm)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to M. Rae Nadler-Olenick, Walter Olenick. (afd)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Wright, Gary) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/10/2018 to flatten image) (afd).
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Wright, Gary) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/10/2018 to flatten image) (afd).
August 10, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE , filed by The United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Wright, Gary) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/10/2018 to flatten image) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Olenick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: M. Rae Nadler-Olenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Walter Olenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gary W. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?