L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C. v. Libyan Foreign Bank
Plaintiff: L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C.
Defendant: Libyan Foreign Bank
Case Number: 1:2018cv00679
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Libyan Foreign Bank. (lt)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C.. Corrected (Carlson, Alan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Alan L. Carlson: re #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. (lt)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C.. (Carlson, Alan)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT (Certified Copies) to #1 Complaint, by L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)(lt)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee received in the amount of $400, receipt number 100033899. (lt) Modified on 9/27/2018 (lt).
August 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee of $400.00 is DUE)( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 100033774), filed by L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits: Copies of Judgment and Translation, #2 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt No. 100033774)(afd) Modified on 8/14/2018 to correct document title (afd).
August 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Unassigned. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C. v. Libyan Foreign Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.M.S. Commodities D.M.C.C.
Represented By: Alan L. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Libyan Foreign Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?