Gillis v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jaydn Gillis
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00784
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Texas Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Scheihing, Robert)
October 25, 2018 11 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (lt)
October 25, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #9 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
October 24, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to file First Amended Answer by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Scheihing, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Notice of Correction: re #8 Pretrial Disclosures. In the future, pursuant to FRCP Rule 5(d)(1), please do not file initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) and (2) or discovery on the docket unless the disclosures or discovery related materials are used in the proceeding or the court orders the filing. (lt)
October 19, 2018 8 Pretrial Disclosures by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Scheihing, Robert)
October 18, 2018 7 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Scheihing, Robert) Modified on 10/19/2018 to clarify docket entry (lt).
October 18, 2018 6 Certificate of Interested Parties by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Scheihing, Robert)
September 18, 2018 5 CORRECTED SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scheihing, Robert) Modified on 9/18/2018 (lt).
September 18, 2018 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Robert F. Scheihing: re #3 Supplement. (lt)
September 18, 2018 3 SUPPLEMENT State Court Records by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Scheihing, Robert)
September 14, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
September 14, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jaydn Gillis, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (cj)
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11229909), filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4)(Scheihing, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillis v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaydn Gillis
Represented By: Shaun W. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert F. Scheihing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?