White et al v. Ditech Financial, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Y. Michelle White and Michelle Musser
Defendant: New Residential Mortgage LLC, SFMC, LP, Bank Of America, N.A., Federal National Mortgage Association, Ditech Financial LLC FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC, Ditech Financial, LLC and New Residential Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00790
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Lane
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Y. Michelle White, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association, Defendant Ditech Financial, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note, #2 Exhibit Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit Assignment of DOT, #4 Exhibit Assignment of DOT, #5 Exhibit Corporate Assignment of DOT, #6 Exhibit Assignment of DOT, #7 Exhibit Notice of Sale, #8 Exhibit Ditech Payment, #9 Exhibit Signed TRO)(Kelly, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Mark Lane. The Response to Dkt. #8 is due no later than November 9, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ks)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Y. Michelle White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order unopposed). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Kelly, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE all claims alleged in this action by Plaintiff Y. Michelle White against Defendant SFMC, LP. ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT SFMC, LP's #6 MOTION to Dismiss. ORDER regarding case style. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Mark Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ks)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Y. Michelle White (Kelly, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Ditech Financial, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Smith, S.)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Original Petition by Ditech Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Gutierrez, Melissa)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief by SFMC, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Behrens, Eric)
September 24, 2018 Set Deadlines: Ditech Financial, LLC answer due 10/5/2018; Federal National Mortgage Association answer due 10/5/2018. (lt)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Mark Lane. The Motion is granted as unopposed pursuant to Dkt. #5. The deadline is extended to October 5, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ks)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition by Ditech Financial, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gutierrez, Melissa)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition by Ditech Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Gutierrez, Melissa)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING all pending and future discovery motions as well as all other nondispositive motions in this case to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. ORDER REFERRING all pending and future dispositive motions in this case to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so.Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
September 14, 2018 COMPLAINT, filed by Y. Michelle White.
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ditech Financial LLC FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11232622), filed by Ditech Financial LLC FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Smith, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Ditech Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Residential Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFMC, LP
Represented By: Eric G. Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Melissa S. Gutierrez
Represented By: S. David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: S. David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Represented By: S. David Smith
Represented By: Melissa S. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Residential Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. Michelle White
Represented By: Keith Steven McMahon
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Kelly
Represented By: Lawrence E. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Musser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?