In Re: James Quezada and Simona Quezada
Defendant: James Quezada and Simona Quezada
Appellant: James Quezada and Simona Quezada
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Appellee: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2018cv00797
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief by James Quezada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension)(Cook, Michael)
November 9, 2018 Notice of Correction: re #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Michael L. Cook. Filer selected wrong event, correction has been made. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td)
November 9, 2018 Notice of Correction: re #4 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings. Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 1/18/2019 02:00 PM. (td)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Counsel Michael L. Cook by James Quezada. (Cook, Michael) Modified on 11/9/2018 to correct event (td).
October 22, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 1/18/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ORAL ARGUMENT. Appellant Brief due by 11/19/2018, Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/2/2019, Appellee Brief due by 12/19/2018, Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 1/18/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) Modified on 11/9/2018 (td).
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court. COMPLETE RECORD Filed (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation, #2 Individual Designations, #3 Complete Docket Sheet) (Wallace, Adam) Plaintiffs and Defendants Exhibits introduced at trial not available electronically. Modified on 10/22/2018 to add text (td).
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted. (afd)
September 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Opening Bankruptcy Case on Notice of Appeal received from Bankruptcy Court. Pursuant to FRBP 8003(d), the Bankruptcy Clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal to District Court. Record on Appeal to follow. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order and Judgment, #3 Docket sheet, #4 List of Parties) (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: James Quezada and Simona Quezada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Quezada and Simona Quezada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James Quezada
Represented By: Michael V. Baumer
Represented By: Michael Lynn Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Simona Quezada
Represented By: Michael V. Baumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Thomas M. Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?