Harger v. Azar
Plaintiff: Rachel Harger
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv00864
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Lane
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rachel Harger. Alex M. Azar, II served on 10/24/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Lance, Charles)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rachel Harger. Alex M. Azar, II served on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Lance, Charles)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rachel Harger. Alex M. Azar, II served on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Lance, Charles)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Charles E. Lance: re #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Certificate of Service. (lt)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rachel Harger (Lance, Charles)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rachel Harger (Lance, Charles)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rachel Harger (Lance, Charles)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Charles Lance re: Case Opening. (afd)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to General Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (afd)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 100034254), filed by Rachel Harger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Letter, Envelope and Receipt #100034254)(afd)
October 12, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (afd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harger v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Harger
Represented By: Charles E. Lance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?