Ruiz v. Fiberlab, Inc.

Plaintiff: Christopher Ruiz
Defendant: Fiberlab, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00871
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Texas Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2018 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Arbitration by Christopher Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
November 29, 2018 Featured Case Text Order GRANTING #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's motion #10 to set aside entry of default entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Plaintiff's response is due on or before December 11, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
November 28, 2018 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Set Aside #8 Clerk's Entry of Default MOTION to Compel by Christopher Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
November 20, 2018 10 MOTION to Set Aside #8 Clerk's Entry of Default by Fiberlab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Richards, Clark). Added MOTION to Compel Arbitraion on 11/20/2018 (td).
November 8, 2018 9 MOTION for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55(b)(1) against Fiberlab, Inc. by Christopher Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
November 8, 2018 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Fiberlab, Inc. (td)
November 7, 2018 7 RESPONSE to #5 Order to Show Cause by Christopher Ruiz. (Mort, Raymond)
November 7, 2018 6 MOTION for Entry of Default against Fiberlab, Inc. by Christopher Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Mort, Raymond)
November 7, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Christopher Ruiz. Show Cause Response due by 11/14/2018,. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
October 15, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Ruiz. Fiberlab, Inc. served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Mort, Raymond)
October 12, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Fiberlab, Inc.. (cj)
October 12, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Christopher Ruiz. (cj)
October 12, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
October 12, 2018 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Christopher Ruiz. (Mort, Raymond)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11336092), filed by Christopher Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Fiberlab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiberlab, Inc.
Represented By: Clark Willis Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ruiz
Represented By: Raymond W Mort, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?