Stockade Franchising, LP v. Kelly Restaurant Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Stockade Franchising, LP
Defendant: Gale Premer, Kelly Restaurant Group, LLC, Kelly Investment Group, LLC and Michael Kelly
Case Number: 1:2018cv00918
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stockade Franchising, LP. Kelly Investment Group, LLC served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018; Kelly Restaurant Group, LLC served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Dow, Matt)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Caitlan J. Morgan. (td)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant Gale Premer's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, to Confirm Arbitration Award. Attorney Ashley N. Gould added to party Gale Premer(pty:dft) by Gale Premer.(Gould, Ashley)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion by Peter R. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter R. Silverman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11390077) by on behalf of Stockade Franchising, LP. (Dow, Matt) Modified on 10/26/2018 to amend text (td).
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael Kelly, Kelly Investment Group, LLC, Kelly Restaurant Group, LLC, Gale Premer. (td)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Stockade Franchising, LP. (Dow, Matt)
October 24, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11379299). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Stockade Franchising, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dow, Matt) Modified on 10/25/2018 to amend document title (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockade Franchising, LP v. Kelly Restaurant Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gale Premer
Represented By: Ashley N. Gould
Represented By: Caitlin J. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Restaurant Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Investment Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stockade Franchising, LP
Represented By: Matt Dow
Represented By: Peter R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?