Roark v. Goodson et al

Plaintiff: Jared Patton Roark
Defendant: Thomas V. Goodson, Guy P. Hoffman, II and Texas Department of Public Safety
Case Number: 1:2018cv00954
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER regarding the parties' Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Texas Department of Public Safety with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) as to Defendant Texas Department of Public Safety by Jared Patton Roark. (Schmerler, Willie)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief in Support by Texas Department of Public Safety. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dennis, Seth)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Seth Byron Dennis added to party Thomas V. Goodson(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Byron Dennis added to party Guy P. Hoffman, II(pty:dft) by Thomas V. Goodson, Guy P. Hoffman, II.(Dennis, Seth)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jared Patton Roark. Guy P. Hoffman, II served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Schmerler, Willie)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jared Patton Roark. Thomas V. Goodson served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Schmerler, Willie)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jared Patton Roark. Texas Department of Public Safety served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Schmerler, Willie)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Thomas V. Goodson, Guy P. Hoffman, II, Texas Department of Public Safety. (cj)
November 5, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jared Patton Roark. (cj)
November 5, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jared Patton Roark. (Schmerler, Willie)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11421157), filed by Jared Patton Roark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schmerler, Willie) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 11/5/2018) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roark v. Goodson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas V. Goodson
Represented By: Seth Byron Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy P. Hoffman, II
Represented By: Seth Byron Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Seth Byron Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Patton Roark
Represented By: Willie Schmerler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?