Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00989
Filed: November 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. amending, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gannon, Kevin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE Regarding Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) by Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING Initial Pretrial Conference for 2/1/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS this action is STAYED, pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 27, 2018 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Gannon, Kevin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Jaynes Decl., #2 Guaragna Decl., #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING Apple Inc.'s #20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 22 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Abendshien Decl., #2 Exhibit 1)(Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (Motion to Transfer Venue) by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Doug Winnard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Emma C. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Michael Pieja to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Alan Littmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Lauren Abendshien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Doug Winnard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11558771) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Emma C. Ross ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11558753) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Michael Pieja ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11558727) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Alan Lilttmann ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11558689) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Lauren Abendshien ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11558589) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Guaragna on behalf of Apple Inc.. Attorney John Michael Guaragna added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Guaragna, John)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (lt)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Latchford, Shawn) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/19/2018 to flatten form) (lt).
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Latchford, Shawn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron S. Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Jacobs, Aaron)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of Complaint. (afd)
November 17, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (afd)
November 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
November 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11468199). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (U.S. Patent No. 6,856,616))(Jacobs, Aaron) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2018 to flatten image) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Shawn A. Latchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Michael Pieja
Represented By: Doug Winnard
Represented By: Emma C. Ross
Represented By: Alan Littmann
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: Lauren Abendshien
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?