Amawi v. Pflugerville Independent School District et al
Plaintiff: Bahia Amawi
Defendant: Pflugerville Independent School District and Ken Paxton
Consolidated Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Houston System, Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System and Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District
Consolidated Plaintiff: George Hale, Zachary Abdelhadi, John Pluecker and Obinna Dennar
Amicus Curiae: State of Arizona
Case Number: 1:2018cv01091
Filed: December 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING #46 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; DENYING #46 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
February 8, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker, re #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Consol Defendant Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Consol Defendant Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District (Saldivar, Edgar)
February 8, 2019 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District, re #46 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Consol Defendant Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Consol Defendant Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District (Brandt, Thomas)
February 8, 2019 Filing 47 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Zachary Abdelhadi, Bahia Amawi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker, re #46 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Consol Defendant Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Consol Defendant Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Masri, Lena)
February 7, 2019 Filing 46 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation , Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Response with Appendix, #2 Appendix Response with Appendix, #3 Proposed Order)(Brandt, Thomas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System, re #24 MOTION to Dismiss and Response to #8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Consol Defendant Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Consol Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Houston System (Abrams, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Trustees of the Klein Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Brandt, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Brandt, Thomas)
January 30, 2019 Filing 42 AMICUS BRIEF by State of Arizona in Support of Defendants. (dm)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
January 30, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #37 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation . ***PLEASE NOTE: When filing a Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations in the AUSTIN Division, the document which exceeds the page limit should NOT be attached to the motion, but rather filed as a separate pleading. We will take the necessary steps to pull the document from the Motion for leave to exceed page limit and get it added to the docket record. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (dm)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #37 Pluecker Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(b), the Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #30 the State of Arizona's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
January 29, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker, re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Including Request for Oral Argument filed by Plaintiff Bahia Amawi (dm)
January 29, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Bahia Amawi, re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Including Request for Oral Argument filed by Plaintiff Bahia Amawi (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bahia Amawi (Reply), #2 Affidavit of Gadeir Abbas (Reply))(Masri, Lena)
January 29, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker, re #24 MOTION to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Consol Defendant Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Consol Defendant Board of Regents of the University of Houston System (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saldivar, Edgar)
January 29, 2019 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Saldivar, Edgar)
January 29, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Dahl O'Leary on behalf of Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. Attorney Laura Dahl O'Leary added to party Trustees of the Klein Independent School District(pty:condft), Attorney Laura Dahl O'Leary added to party Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District(pty:condft) (O'Leary, Laura)
January 29, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Francisco J. Valenzuela on behalf of Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. Attorney Francisco J. Valenzuela added to party Trustees of the Klein Independent School District(pty:condft), Attorney Francisco J. Valenzuela added to party Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District(pty:condft) (Valenzuela, Francisco)
January 29, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Phillip Brandt on behalf of Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. Attorney Thomas Phillip Brandt added to party Trustees of the Klein Independent School District(pty:condft), Attorney Thomas Phillip Brandt added to party Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District(pty:condft) (Brandt, Thomas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 33 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker, re #32 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff Zachary Abdelhadi and Obinna Dennar's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Consol Defendant Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Consol Defendant Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saldivar, Edgar)
January 25, 2019 Filing 32 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff Zachary Abdelhadi and Obinna Dennar's #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brandt, Thomas) Modified on 1/25/2019 (td).
January 24, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Ken Paxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Abrams, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Diana Day. by State of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Arizona Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Day, Diana)
January 22, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Diana Day on behalf of State of Arizona. Attorney Diana Day added to party State of Arizona(pty:am) (Day, Diana)
January 22, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #28 Waiver of Service Executed, #27 Waiver of Service Executed. Waiver sent date and answer due date modified. (td)
January 18, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Hale, Obinna Dennar, John Pluecker, Zachary Abdelhadi as to Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. Waiver sent on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Saldivar, Edgar) Modified on 1/22/2019 to correct waiver sent date and answer due date (td).
January 18, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Hale, Obinna Dennar, John Pluecker, Zachary Abdelhadi as to Trustees of the Klein Independent School District. Waiver sent on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Saldivar, Edgar) Modified on 1/22/2019 to correct date waiver sent and answer due date (td).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #26 Pluecker, Dennar, Abdelhadi, and Hale's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Plaintiffs' reply to Defendants' motions [24, 25] is due on or before January 29, 2019.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
January 17, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 Response to Motion, #24 MOTION to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saldivar, Edgar)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #23 Defendant Ken Paxton's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
January 15, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Ken Paxton, re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Including Request for Oral Argument filed by Plaintiff Bahia Amawi Defendant Ken Paxton's Response to Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael)
January 15, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael)
January 15, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Defendant Ken Paxton's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Omnibus Response to Motions for Preliminary Injunction by Ken Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Consolidate Cases. ORDER that Case No. 1:18-cv-1091-RP is hereby CONSOLIDATED with Pluecker et al. v. Paxton et al., Case No. 1:18-cv-1100-RP. This case, Amawi v. Pflugerville Independent School District et al., Case No. 1:18-CV-1091-RP, is DESIGNATED as the lead case, and all further filings should be made in that cause number. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 10, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opposition to Case Consolidation by Bahia Amawi re #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Masri, Lena)
January 10, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #20 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Consolidate Cases Remain Pending. (td)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDERED that Defendant Paxton's second motion for extension of time, (Dkt. #17 ), is GRANTED IN PART. Defendant Paxton's response to Amawi's motion for preliminary injunction, (Dkt. #8 ), is due on or before January 15, 2019. FURTHER ORDERED that Amawi's response to Defendant Paxton's motion for consolidation, (Dkt. 14), is due on or before January 11, 2019. Defendant Paxton's reply to Amawis response, if any, is due on or before January 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Modified on 1/10/2019 to correct text (td).
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Bahia Amawi, re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Ken Paxton (Abbas, Gadeir)
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Conditional Stipulation to Injunctive Relief by PFISD and by Bahia Amawi re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Including Request for Oral Argument (Masri, Lena)
January 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions for Preliminary Injunction by Ken Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randall Wilson Miller on behalf of Ken Paxton (Miller, Randall)
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Abrams on behalf of Ken Paxton (Abrams, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Ken Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Defendant Ken Paxton's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #8 entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's response to the motion is due on or before January 8, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Including Request for Oral Argument by Ken Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abrams, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gadeir I. Abbas. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lena Masri. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carolyn HOmer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bahia Amawi as to Ken Paxton. Waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Floyd, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Including Request for Oral Argument by Bahia Amawi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo in Support, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(Floyd, John)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Floyd, III for Lena F. Masri ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11571962) by on behalf of Bahia Amawi. (Floyd, John)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Floyd, III for Gadeir I. Abbas ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11571938) by on behalf of Bahia Amawi. (Floyd, John)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Floyd, III for Carolyn M. Homer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11571903) by on behalf of Bahia Amawi. (Floyd, John)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ken Paxton, Pflugerville Independent School District. (cj)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Gadeir I. Abbas, Carolyn M. Homer, and Lena Masri, for Plaintiff Bahia Amawi, re: non-admitted status. (cj)
December 16, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bahia Amawi. (cj)
December 16, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
December 16, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bahia Amawi. (Floyd, John)
December 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11560917), filed by Bahia Amawi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Floyd, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amawi v. Pflugerville Independent School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pflugerville Independent School District
Represented By: Todd Aaron Clark
Represented By: Joey W. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Represented By: Randall Wilson Miller
Represented By: Michael Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahia Amawi
Represented By: Christopher M. Choate
Represented By: John T. Floyd, III
Represented By: Gadeir L. Abbas
Represented By: Lena F. Masri
Represented By: Carolyn Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Houston System
Represented By: Randall Wilson Miller
Represented By: Michael Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Trustees of the Klein Independent School District
Represented By: Laura Dahl O'Leary
Represented By: Francisco J. Valenzuela
Represented By: Thomas Phillip Brandt
Represented By: Caroline Sileo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System
Represented By: Randall Wilson Miller
Represented By: Michael Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District
Represented By: Laura Dahl O'Leary
Represented By: Francisco J. Valenzuela
Represented By: Thomas Phillip Brandt
Represented By: Caroline Sileo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: George Hale
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Adriana Cecilia Pinon
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Represented By: Brian M. Hauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Zachary Abdelhadi
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Adriana Cecilia Pinon
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Represented By: Brian M. Hauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Pluecker
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Adriana Cecilia Pinon
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Represented By: Brian M. Hauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Obinna Dennar
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Adriana Cecilia Pinon
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Represented By: Brian M. Hauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Arizona
Represented By: Diana Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?