Odell v. SG Administration, LP
Plaintiff: Valerie Odell
Defendant: Spaw-Glass, Inc. and SG Administration, LP
Case Number: 1:2018cv01099
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING Initial Pretrial Conference for 9/16/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Scheduling Order by SG Administration, LP. (Tower, Julie)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Defenses and ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint . Attorney Patrick S. Richter added to party SG Administration, LP(pty:dft) by SG Administration, LP.(Richter, Patrick)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SG Administration, LP, filed by Valerie Odell.(lt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valerie Odell. Spaw-Glass, Inc. served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Simon, Kell)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Spaw-Glass, Inc.. (cj)
December 18, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Valerie Odell. (cj)
December 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VALERIE ODELL. (Simon, Kell)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11567774), filed by VALERIE ODELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simon, Kell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odell v. SG Administration, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Odell
Represented By: Kell Ascher Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spaw-Glass, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Administration, LP
Represented By: Patrick S. Richter
Represented By: Julie C. Tower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?