Pluecker et al v. Paxton et al
Plaintiff: John Pluecker, Zachary Abdelhadi, George Hale and Obinna Dennar
Defendant: Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System, Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District, Ken Paxton and Trustees of the Klein Independent School District
Case Number: 1:2018cv01100
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 All future pleadings should be filed in 1:18-cv-1091-RP (Lead Case). PLEASE DO NOT file any further pleadings in this case. (lt)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Case No. 1:18-cv-1091-RP, is hereby CONSOLIDATED with Pluecker et al. v. Paxton et al., Case No. 1:18-cv-1100-RP. Amawi v. Pflugerville Independent School District et al., Case No. 1:18-CV-1091-RP, is DESIGNATED as the lead case, and all further filings should be made in that cause number. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Declaration of Christopher Clay, #3 Declaration of Zachary Abdelhadi, #4 Declaration of Obinna Dennar, #5 Declaration of George Hale, #6 Declaration of John Pluecker, #7 Proposed Order)(lt)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Motion for Overlength Brief, #2 Exhibit Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Memo in Support of Preliminary Injunction, #4 Affidavit of Christopher Clay In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Affidavit of Zachary Abdelhadi In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Affidavit of Obinna Dennar In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Affidavit of George Hale In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Affidavit of John Pluecker In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #9 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Saldivar, Edgar)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Brian M. Hauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker as to Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System. Waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Board of Regents of the University of Houston System. Waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Ken Paxton. Waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Waiver, #2 Waiver)(Saldivar, Edgar)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edgar Saldivar for Brian Hauss ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11595436) by on behalf of Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Saldivar, Edgar)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System, Board of Regents of the University of Houston System, Ken Paxton, Trustees of the Klein Independent School District, Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District. (lt)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Andre Ivan Segura to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Vera Eidelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case and Forthcoming Motion Practice by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker (Saldivar, Edgar)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edgar Saldivar for Andre Ivan Segura ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11579671) by on behalf of Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Saldivar, Edgar)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edgar Saldivar for Vera Eidelman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11576236) by on behalf of Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Saldivar, Edgar)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Saldivar, Edgar)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letters to Andre Segura, Brian Hauss, Vera Eidelman and Kevin Dubose. (afd)
December 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11568301). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Zachary Abdelhadi, Obinna Dennar, George Hale, John Pluecker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saldivar, Edgar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pluecker et al v. Paxton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the Texas A&M University System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Houston System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Lewisville Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the Klein Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pluecker
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Adriana Cecilia Pinon
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Brian M. Hauss
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Abdelhadi
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Adriana Cecilia Pinon
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Brian M. Hauss
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Hale
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Adriana Cecilia Pinon
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Brian M. Hauss
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obinna Dennar
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Adriana Cecilia Pinon
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Brian M. Hauss
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?