HCB Financial Corp. v. McPherson et al

Plaintiff: HCB Financial Corp.
Defendant: Organic Health Sciences, LLC, Neil McPherson, Brenda L. Adkinson, Medicus Arkansas, LLC, Medicus Arkansas III, LLC, Lee Kennedy Investments, L.P., Compassionate Use, LLC, Rockcliff Holdings-GP, LLC, Hungrey Otter Holdings, LLC, Anita L. Williams, LKF Investments-Texas, LLC, Emmanuel Kniahynycky, 5950 State Bridge Road, LLC, Hyperion Management, LLC, Harry Rauch Freyer, KWF Group, LLC, Canndescent JV, LLC, Summer Winds Georgia, LLC, LFK GP, LLC, Palms Destin Holdings, LLC, Compassionate Use II, LLC, Lee K McPherson, BK Properties II, LLC, Rockcliff Holdings, LP, LK Freyer Investments, LLC, Fountain Square FWB Holdings, LLC, Freyer Investments, LP, Hyperion Gulf Coast Ventures, LTD., Hyperion GP, LLC, Janet Kniahynycky, Samuel Reynolds, Medicus Arkansas II, LLC, Lee K. McPherson, Lee K. Freyer, Freyer Investments, LTD., Hungry Otter Holdings, LLC, Lee F. Kennedy, Lee Karen Freyer and Lee Kennedy
Case Number: 1:2018cv01120
Filed: December 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by 5950 State Bridge Road, LLC, Brenda L. Adkinson, BK Properties II, LLC, Canndescent JV, LLC, Compassionate Use II, LLC, Compassionate Use, LLC, Fountain Square FWB Holdings, LLC, Harry Rauch Freyer, Freyer Investments, LTD., Hungry Otter Holdings, LLC, Hyperion GP, LLC, Hyperion Gulf Coast Ventures, LTD., Hyperion Management, LLC, KWF Group, LLC, Emmanuel Kniahynycky, Janet Kniahynycky, LFK GP, LLC, LK Freyer Investments, LLC, LKF Investments-Texas, LLC, Lee Kennedy Investments, L.P., Medicus Arkansas II, LLC, Medicus Arkansas III, LLC, Medicus Arkansas, LLC, Organic Health Sciences, LLC, Samuel Reynolds, Rockcliff Holdings, LP, Rockcliff Holdings-GP, LLC, Summer Winds Georgia, LLC, Anita L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knight, Joseph)
February 8, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HCB Financial Corp.. BK Properties II, LLC served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/22/2019; Anita L. Williams served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Cheatham, Robin)
January 28, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HCB Financial Corp.. Emmanuel Kniahynycky served on 1/9/2019, answer due 2/22/2019; Janet Kniahynycky served on 1/9/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Served)(Cheatham, Robin)
January 23, 2019 Filing 22 Letter to Attorney Hallie E. Graves re: non-admitted status. (lt)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint ; 5950 State Bridge Road, LLC, BK Properties II, LLC, Canndescent JV, LLC, Compassionate Use II, LLC, Fountain Square FWB Holdings, LLC, Hungry Otter Holdings, LLC, Hyperion GP, LLC, Emmanuel Kniahynycky, Janet Kniahynycky, LFK GP, LLC, LKF Investments-Texas, LLC, Lee Kennedy Investments, L.P., Organic Health Sciences, LLC, Rockcliff Holdings, LP, Rockcliff Holdings-GP, LLC, and Anita L. Williams answers due 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; Brenda L. Adkinson, Compassionate Use, LLC, Harry Rauch Freyer, Freyer Investments, LTD, Hyperion Gulf Coast Ventures, LTD, Hyperion Management, LLC, LK Freyer Investments, LLC, Medicus Arkansas, LLC, Medicus Arkansas II, LLC, Medicus Arkansas III, Samuel Reynolds and Summer Winds Georgia, LLC answers due 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
January 21, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by 5950 State Bridge Road, LLC, BK Properties II, LLC, Canndescent JV, LLC, Compassionate Use II, LLC, Fountain Square FWB Holdings, LLC, Harry Rauch Freyer, Hungry Otter Holdings, LLC, Hyperion GP, LLC, KWF Group, LLC, Emmanuel Kniahynycky, Janet Kniahynycky, LFK GP, LLC, LKF Investments-Texas, LLC, Lee Kennedy Investments, L.P., Medicus Arkansas II, LLC, Medicus Arkansas III, LLC, Medicus Arkansas, LLC, Organic Health Sciences, LLC, Rockcliff Holdings, LP, Rockcliff Holdings-GP, LLC, Anita L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knight, Joseph)
January 20, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by Brenda L. Adkinson, Compassionate Use, LLC, Harry Rauch Freyer, Freyer Investments, LTD., Hyperion Gulf Coast Ventures, LTD., Hyperion Management, LLC, LK Freyer Investments, LLC, Medicus Arkansas II, LLC, Medicus Arkansas III, LLC, Medicus Arkansas, LLC, Samuel Reynolds, Summer Winds Georgia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knight, Joseph)
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HCB Financial Corp.. Hyperion Management, LLC served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Cheatham, Robin)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HCB Financial Corp.. Harry Rauch Freyer (in individual capacity and as trustee) served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019; LK Freyer Investments, LLC served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; Medicus Arkansas II, LLC served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; Medicus Arkansas III, LLC served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; Medicus Arkansas, LLC served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019; Summer Winds Georgia, LLC served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of service, #3 Affidavit of service, #4 Affidavit of service, #5 Affidavit of service, #6 Affidavit of service, #7 Affidavit of service, #8 Affidavit of service)(Cheatham, Robin) Modified on 1/14/2019 (lt).
January 9, 2019 Please Disregard the previously entered Notice of Correction: re #13 Summons Returned Executed. The subject Returns for both parties listed were properly filed. No further action is required. (lt)
January 9, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Reissued as to Hyperion Management, LLC. (lt)
January 9, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #13 Summons Returned Executed. The document is a single page reflecting service on Freyer Investments, Ltd. Filing User also selected a second party, Compassionate Use, LLC, but that service is not reflected here. The entry and record have been modified accordingly. (lt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by HCB Financial Corp.. (Cheatham, Robin)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HCB Financial Corp. Compassionate Use LLC and Freyer Investments, LTD. served on 1/7/2019, answers due 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Cheatham, Robin) Modified to restore text. (lt)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Jason M. Osborn to Appear Pro Hac Vice for HCB Financial Corp. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robin B. Cheatham for Jason M. Osborn ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11609166) by on behalf of HCB Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheatham, Robin)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HCB Financial Corp.. Brenda L. Adkinson served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019; Hyperion Gulf Coast Ventures, LTD. served on 12/31/2018, answer due 1/21/2019; Samuel Reynolds served on 12/31/2018, answer due 1/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Cheatham, Robin)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to 5950 State Bridge Road, LLC, BK Properties II, LLC, Canndescent JV, LLC, Compassionate Use II, LLC, Compassionate Use, LLC, Fountain Square FWB Holdings, LLC, Harry Rauch Freyer, Freyer Investments, LTD., Hungry Otter Holdings, LLC, Hyperion GP, LLC, Hyperion Management, LLC, KWF Group, LLC, Emmanuel Kniahynycky, Janet Kniahynycky, LFK GP, LLC, LK Freyer Investments, LLC, LKF Investments-Texas, LLC, Lee Kennedy Investments, L.P., Lee K. McPherson, Neil McPherson, Medicus Arkansas II, LLC, Medicus Arkansas III, LLC, Medicus Arkansas, LLC, Organic Health Sciences, LLC, Palms Destin Holdings, LLC, Rockcliff Holdings, LP, Rockcliff Holdings-GP, LLC, Summer Winds Georgia, LLC, Anita L. Williams. (lt)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by HCB Financial Corp.. For Harry Rauch Fryer Individually and as Trustee for Trust of Babette Weiner and Hyperion Management, LLC (Cheatham, Robin)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by HCB Financial Corp.. (Cheatham, Robin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hyperion Gulf Coast Ventures, LTD., Samuel Reynolds, and Brenda L. Adkinson. (lt)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by HCB Financial Corp.. against Hyperion Gulf Coast Ventures, Ltd., Samuel Reynolds and Brenda L. Adkinson, in her capacity as Trustee of the Trust U/W/O Babette L. Wiener Dated 10/30/1984 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Exhibit Request for Issuance of Summons)(Cheatham, Robin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits 150 and 200 to Complaint which were Initially Rejected by Court's CM/ECF Electronic Filing System by HCB Financial Corp. re #1 Complaint,,,, (Cheatham, Robin)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Jason Michael Osborn. (afd)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HCB Financial Corp.. (Cheatham, Robin)
December 24, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HCB Financial Corp.. (afd)
December 24, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
December 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11586950). No Summons requested at this time, filed by HCB Financial Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-16, #3 Exhibit 17 pt 1, #4 Exhibit 17 pt 2, #5 Exhibit 17 pt 3, #6 Exhibit 18-29, #7 Exhibit 30-33, #8 Exhibit 34-36, #9 Exhibit 37 pt 1, #10 Exhibit 37 pt 2, #11 Exhibit 38-39, #12 Exhibit 40-50, #13 Exhibit 51-65, #14 Exhibit 66-81, #15 Exhibit 82-85, #16 Exhibit 86-100, #17 Exhibit 101-117, #18 Exhibit 118-121, #19 Exhibit 122, #20 Exhibit 123, #21 Exhibit 124-133, #22 Exhibit 134, #23 Exhibit 135, #24 Exhibit 136-148, #25 Exhibit 149, #26 Exhibit 151, #27 Exhibit 152 pt 1, #28 Exhibit 152 pt 2, #29 Exhibit 153-162, #30 Exhibit 163, #31 Exhibit 164-167, #32 Exhibit 168-169, #33 Exhibit 170-175, #34 Exhibit 176-185, #35 Exhibit 186-199, #36 Exhibit 201-210, #37 Exhibit 211-215, #38 Exhibit 216-223, #39 Exhibit 224-225, #40 Exhibit 226-231, #41 Exhibit 232 pt 1, #42 Exhibit 232 pt 2, #43 Exhibit 233-250, #44 Exhibit 251, #45 Exhibit 252-259, #46 Exhibit 260, #47 Exhibit 261-280)(Cheatham, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HCB Financial Corp. v. McPherson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic Health Sciences, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda L. Adkinson
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicus Arkansas, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicus Arkansas III, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Kennedy Investments, L.P.
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compassionate Use, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockcliff Holdings-GP, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hungrey Otter Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita L. Williams
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LKF Investments-Texas, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel Kniahynycky
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5950 State Bridge Road, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyperion Management, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Rauch Freyer
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KWF Group, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canndescent JV, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Winds Georgia, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LFK GP, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palms Destin Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compassionate Use II, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee K McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BK Properties II, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockcliff Holdings, LP
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LK Freyer Investments, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fountain Square FWB Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freyer Investments, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyperion Gulf Coast Ventures, LTD.
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyperion GP, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Kniahynycky
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Reynolds
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicus Arkansas II, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee K. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee K. Freyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freyer Investments, LTD.
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hungry Otter Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Hallie Elizabeth Graves
Represented By: Joseph R. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee F. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Karen Freyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HCB Financial Corp.
Represented By: Matthew D. Storey
Represented By: Scott Robert Cheatham
Represented By: Jason M. Osborn
Represented By: Robin B. Cheatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?