Franks v. City of Austin

Plaintiff: Justin Kyle Franks
Defendant: City of Austin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00040
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew W Austin
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Original Answer and Requests for Affirmative Defenses by Justin Kyle Franks (lt)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint . Attorney Meghan L. Riley added to party City of Austin(pty:dft) by City of Austin.(Riley, Meghan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Kyle Franks. City of Austin served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (lt)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Exhibit to Complaint #1 by Justin Kyle Franks. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibit) Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (lt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Austin, filed by Justin Kyle Franks.(lt)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING all pending and future discovery motions as well as allother nondispositive motions to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin for resolution. ORDER REFERRING all pending and future dispositive motions to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (lt)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Justin Kyle Franks. (lt)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Austin. (afd)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Justin Kyle Franks. (afd)
January 16, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Justin Kyle Franks. (afd)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 100034954), filed by Justin Kyle Franks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt No. 100034954)(afd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franks v. City of Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Austin
Represented By: Meghan L. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Kyle Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?