TFC Partners Inc. v. Stratton Amenities, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TFC Partners Inc.
Defendant: Greystar Management Company, SVF Northshore Austin, LP, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, Jolyne D. Shepard and GS Rio, LP
Counter Plaintiff: Stratton Amenities, LLC, Benjamin F. Roberts and Saira Escamilla Ruiz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00058
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING #130 Motion for Redaction Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
March 21, 2019 Filing 130 Unopposed MOTION to Redact re #115 Transcript Filed,,, by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
March 13, 2019 Filing 129 Redacted Transcript filed re: #62 Transcript. (Andasola, Pamela)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING #126 Motion to Redact re #62 Transcript. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING #125 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Claims Against Jolyne Shepard. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
March 11, 2019 Filing 126 Unopposed MOTION to Redact re #62 Transcript by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
March 11, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Claims against Jolyne Shepard by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDERED that the preliminary injunction hearing set for March 11, 2019, is CANCELLED pending further order of this Court. FURTHER ORDERED that all parties shall file dismissal documents or a status report detailing their efforts to resolve this matter on or before April 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
March 6, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by TFC Partners Inc. (Secco, Marisa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Settlement by Benjamin F. Roberts, Saira Escamilla Ruiz, Stratton Amenities, LLC (Squires, Ryan)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER regarding schedule for hearing on the motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING #119 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
March 1, 2019 Filing 119 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Benjamin F. Roberts, Saira Escamilla Ruiz, Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Squires, Ryan)
March 1, 2019 Filing 118 Sealed Document filed. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 46, #4 Exhibit 47, #5 Exhibit 48, #6 Exhibit 51, #7 Exhibit 61, #8 Exhibit 62, #9 Exhibit 72, #10 Exhibit 77, #11 Exhibit 87, #12 Exhibit 93, #13 Exhibit 97, #14 Exhibit 167, #15 Exhibit 195, #16 Exhibit 199, #17 Exhibit 216, #18 Exhibit 220, #19 Exhibit 223, #20 Exhibit 230, #21 Exhibit 339) (lt)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #117 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #116 NFC's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that NFC may file a total of 21 pages for their Reply to Defendants GS Rio, LP d/b/a Seven Apartments, SVF Northshore Austin, LP d/b/a Northshore Apartments, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, and Greystar Management Company (together, "the Customer Defendants"), exclusive of the caption, signature block, certificate of conference, certificate of service, and accompanying documents. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 28, 2019 Filing 117 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Customer Defendants, #3 Sealed Document Proposed Order, #4 Sealed Document Declaration of Kellie Corbin, #5 Sealed Document Exhibit 46, #6 Sealed Document Exhibit 47, #7 Sealed Document Exhibit 48, #8 Sealed Document Exhibit 51, #9 Sealed Document Exhibit 61, #10 Sealed Document Exhibit 62, #11 Sealed Document Exhibit 72, #12 Sealed Document Exhibit 77, #13 Sealed Document Exhibit 87, #14 Sealed Document Exhibit 93, #15 Sealed Document Exhibit 97, #16 Sealed Document Exhibit 167, #17 Sealed Document Exhibit 195, #18 Sealed Document Exhibit 199, #19 Sealed Document Exhibit 216, #20 Sealed Document Exhibit 220, #21 Sealed Document Exhibit 223, #22 Sealed Document Exhibit 230, #23 Sealed Document Exhibit 339) (Secco, Marisa)
February 28, 2019 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation of NFC's Reply in Support of Preliminary Injunction by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
February 28, 2019 Filing 115 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on February 26, 2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela J. Andasola, pjandasola@comcast.net, Telephone number: (210) 244-5038. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/21/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2019, (Andasola, Pamela)
February 27, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by TFC Partners Inc. (Secco, Marisa)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER regarding motion briefing. ORDER RESETTING time for Hearing on #36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing reset for 3/11/2019 at 09:00 AM CST before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
February 27, 2019 Filing 112 Witness List for Hearing Held February 26, 2019. (lt)
February 27, 2019 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by TFC Partners Inc. for proceedings held on 2/26/2019. Proceedings Transcribed: Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Court Reporter: Pamela J. Andasola, CSR/RMR/FCRR. (Secco, Marisa)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER CONTINUING Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction until March 11, 2019, for all parties. ORDER EXTENDING the temporary restraining order currently in effect #95 for good cause until March 12, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. CST. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
February 26, 2019 Filing 109 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2019 re Preliminary Injunction. Hearing continued to March 11, 2019. Written Order Forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(lt)
February 26, 2019 Filing 108 Sealed Document filed. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction. SEALED exhibits filed with Dkt. # 107 are voluminous; they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed herewith. See 2/26/2019 Text Order granting #107 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document (lt)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #107 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #106 NFC's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that NFC may file a total of 27 pages for their Reply to Defendants Stratton, Roberts, and Ruiz, exclusive of the caption, signature block, certificate of conference, certificate of service, and accompanying documents. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 26, 2019 Filing 107 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Sealed Document Proposed Order, #4 Sealed Document Declaration of Kellie Corbin, #5 Sealed Document Ex 2, #6 Sealed Document Ex 3, #7 Sealed Document Ex 7, #8 Sealed Document Ex 8, #9 Sealed Document Ex 9, #10 Sealed Document Ex 10, #11 Sealed Document Ex 11, #12 Sealed Document Ex 13, #13 Sealed Document Ex 19, #14 Sealed Document Ex 25, #15 Sealed Document Ex 26, #16 Sealed Document Ex 28, #17 Sealed Document Ex 30, #18 Sealed Document Ex 46, #19 Sealed Document Ex 47, #20 Sealed Document Ex 48, #21 Sealed Document Ex 51, #22 Sealed Document Ex 52, #23 Sealed Document Ex 53, #24 Sealed Document Ex 55, #25 Sealed Document Ex 56, #26 Sealed Document Ex 57, #27 Sealed Document Ex 58, #28 Sealed Document Ex 60, #29 Sealed Document Ex 61, #30 Sealed Document Ex 63B, #31 Sealed Document Ex 67, #32 Sealed Document Ex 70, #33 Sealed Document Ex 72, #34 Sealed Document Ex 77, #35 Sealed Document Ex 83, #36 Sealed Document Ex 87, #37 Sealed Document Ex 88, #38 Sealed Document Ex 93, #39 Sealed Document Ex 103, #40 Sealed Document Ex 110, #41 Sealed Document Ex 117, #42 Sealed Document Ex 126, #43 Sealed Document Ex 159, #44 Sealed Document Ex 164, #45 Sealed Document Ex 167, #46 Sealed Document Ex 170, #47 Sealed Document Ex 171, #48 Sealed Document Ex 187, #49 Sealed Document Ex 199, #50 Sealed Document Ex 205, #51 Sealed Document Ex 219, #52 Sealed Document Ex 223, #53 Sealed Document Ex 230, #54 Sealed Document Ex 244, #55 Sealed Document Ex 246, #56 Sealed Document Ex 252, #57 Sealed Document Ex 269, #58 Sealed Document Ex 277, #59 Sealed Document Ex 278, #60 Sealed Document Ex 335) (Secco, Marisa)
February 26, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation of NFC's Reply in Support of Preliminary Injunction by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #105 Stratton Parties' Motion to Strike entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In order to allow the Court a reasonable time to consider any Reply by NFC before ruling on the motion for a preliminary injunction, IT IS ORDERED that NFC may file a Reply, if any, no later than Tuesday, February 26, 2019, at 5:00 p.m. CST. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 25, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION to Strike by Benjamin F. Roberts, Saira Escamilla Ruiz, Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Trahan, Paul)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING #102 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 25, 2019 Filing 103 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Benjamin F. Roberts, Saira Escamilla Ruiz, Stratton Amenities, LLC, re #102 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiff's Requests for Production filed by Plaintiff TFC Partners Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Trahan, Paul)
February 22, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiff's Requests for Production by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Secco, Marisa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 101 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Jason K. Fagelman added to party Benjamin F. Roberts(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against TFC Partners Inc. by Benjamin F. Roberts, Saira Escamilla Ruiz.(Fagelman, Jason)
February 22, 2019 Filing 100 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against TFC Partners Inc. by Stratton Amenities, LLC.(Fagelman, Jason)
February 22, 2019 Filing 99 Sealed Opposition of Stratton Amenities, LLC, Benjamin F. Roberts, and Saira Escamilla Ruiz to Motion for Preliminary Injuncton. Clerk notes exhibits to this pleading are included in document #92 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. As exhibits are voluminous, they will not be copied into this entry but are considered filed. (td)
February 22, 2019 Filing 98 Sealed Customer Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A part 2, #3 Exhibit A part 3, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Order) (td)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #97 Stratton Parties' Motion to Join in the Customer Defendants' Motion to Grant Relief from the Court's Order and to Extend the Filing Deadline for their Response to the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Based on the evidence provided, the Court is satisfied that the parties were confronted by genuine technical difficulties during filing, and that they endeavored in good faith to meet their filing deadline. IT IS ORDERED that the Court's Order to Strike Untimely Responses (Dkt. 93) is WITHDRAWN with respect to the Stratton Parties. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #96 Customer Defendants' Motion to Grant Relief from the Court's Order and to Extend the Filing Deadline for their Response to the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Based on the evidence provided, the Court is satisfied that the parties were confronted by genuine technical difficulties during filing, and that they endeavored in good faith to meet their filing deadline. IT IS ORDERED that the Court's Order to Strike Untimely Responses (Dkt. 93) is WITHDRAWN with respect to Customer Defendants. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 22, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION to Join in Customer Defendants' Motion for Leave and Motion to Reconsider by Benjamin F. Roberts, Saira Escamilla Ruiz, Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Trahan, Paul)
February 22, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION - Customer Defendants' Motion to Grant Relief from the Court's Order and to Extend Filing Deadline for Their Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #93 Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document, by GS Rio, LP, Greystar Management Company, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, SVF Northshore Austin, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit B-1, #6 Exhibit B-2, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Proposed Order)(Sencenbaugh, Adam)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #94 Stratton Parties' Motion for Leave to File Late entered by Judge Robert Pitman. For the reasons given in the Court's Order Striking the Untimely Responses, (Dkt. #93 ), the motion is denied. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER AMENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND RESETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING FOR STRATTON, ROBERTS, RUIZ, AND SHEPARD. ORDERED that the preliminary injunction hearing in this case is RESET for STRATTON, ROBERTS, RUIZ, and SHEPARD for Tuesday, February 26, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 22, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to File Opposition of Stratton Amenities LLC, Benjamin F. Roberts and Saira Escamilla Ruiz to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Benjamin F. Roberts, Saira Escamilla Ruiz, Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trahan, Paul)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER*** ORDER STRIKING #91 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document; STRIKING #92 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) Modified on 2/22/2019 (td).
February 21, 2019 Filing 92 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document, #4 Sealed Document, #5 Sealed Document, #6 Sealed Document, #7 Sealed Document, #8 Sealed Document, #9 Sealed Document, #10 Sealed Document, #11 Sealed Document, #12 Sealed Document, #13 Sealed Document, #14 Sealed Document, #15 Sealed Document, #16 Sealed Document, #17 Sealed Document, #18 Sealed Document, #19 Sealed Document, #20 Sealed Document, #21 Sealed Document, #22 Sealed Document, #23 Sealed Document, #24 Sealed Document, #25 Sealed Document, #26 Sealed Document, #27 Sealed Document, #28 Sealed Document, #29 Sealed Document, #30 Sealed Document, #31 Sealed Document, #32 Sealed Document, #33 Sealed Document, #34 Sealed Document, #35 Sealed Document, #36 Sealed Document, #37 Sealed Document, #38 Sealed Document, #39 Sealed Document, #40 Sealed Document, #41 Sealed Document, #42 Sealed Document, #43 Sealed Document, #44 Sealed Document, #45 Sealed Document, #46 Sealed Document, #47 Sealed Document, #48 Sealed Document, #49 Sealed Document, #50 Sealed Document, #51 Sealed Document, #52 Sealed Document, #53 Sealed Document, #54 Sealed Document, #55 Sealed Document, #56 Sealed Document, #57 Sealed Document, #58 Sealed Document, #59 Sealed Document, #60 Sealed Document, #61 Sealed Document, #62 Sealed Document, #63 Sealed Document, #64 Sealed Document, #65 Sealed Document, #66 Sealed Document, #67 Sealed Document, #68 Sealed Document, #69 Sealed Document, #70 Sealed Document, #71 Sealed Document, #72 Sealed Document, #73 Sealed Document, #74 Sealed Document, #75 Sealed Document, #76 Sealed Document, #77 Sealed Document, #78 Sealed Document, #79 Sealed Document, #80 Sealed Document, #81 Sealed Document, #82 Sealed Document, #83 Sealed Document, #84 Sealed Document, #85 Sealed Document, #86 Sealed Document, #87 Sealed Document) (Trahan, Paul) Modified on 2/22/2019 (td). Modified on 2/22/2019 (td).
February 21, 2019 Filing 91 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A part 1, #4 Exhibit A part 2, #5 Exhibit A part 3, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Proposed Order) (Sencenbaugh, Adam) Modified on 2/22/2019 (td). Modified on 2/22/2019 (td).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #90 Customer Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Customer Defendants may file a total of 29 pages to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Dkt. 36), and Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief, (Dkt. 73), exclusive of the caption, signature block, certificate of conference, certificate of service, and accompanying documents. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #88 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Shepard will receive further instructions by e-mail. Shepard is not required to file electronically, but the Court strongly recommends that she register as soon as possible once she receives instructions. Once Shepard registers, the Court will assume that Shepard receives immediate electronic notifications and reviews all docket activity. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by GS Rio, LP, Greystar Management Company, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, SVF Northshore Austin, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sencenbaugh, Adam)
February 21, 2019 Filing 89 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by TFC Partners Inc., re #85 MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff TFC Partners Inc. (Secco, Marisa)
February 21, 2019 Filing 88 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Jolyne D. Shepard. (td)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #87 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Stratton Parties may file a total of 45 pages to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Dkt. 36), and Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief, (Dkt. 73), exclusive of the caption, signature block, certificate of conference, and certificate of service, and accompanying documents. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 21, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Benjamin F. Roberts, Saira Escamilla Ruiz, Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trahan, Paul)
February 21, 2019 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Benjamin F. Roberts, Saira Escamilla Ruiz, Stratton Amenities, LLC, re #85 MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff TFC Partners Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Trahan, Paul)
February 20, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
February 20, 2019 Filing 84 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Trahan, Paul)
February 20, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Trahan on behalf of Saira Escamilla Ruiz. Attorney Paul Trahan added to party Saira Escamilla Ruiz(pty:dft) (Trahan, Paul)
February 20, 2019 Filing 82 Advisory on Status of Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 20, 2019 Motion Hearing: #36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing reset for 3/11/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER to File Joint Proposed Amended TRO and Resetting Preliminary Injunction Hearing Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 20, 2019 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Stratton Amenities, LLC, re #74 MOTION to Narrow TRO to Allow for Mediation and to Reset th Preliminary Injunction Hearing for All Parties filed by Defendant Stratton Amenities, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Trahan, Paul)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #77 Customer-Defendants' Motion to Strike entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Customer-Defendants' Response filed at Dkt. #76 is STRUCK. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 20, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by GS Rio, LP, Greystar Management Company, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, SVF Northshore Austin, LP, re #74 MOTION to Narrow TRO to Allow for Mediation and to Reset th Preliminary Injunction Hearing for All Parties filed by Defendant Stratton Amenities, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sencenbaugh, Adam)
February 20, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Strike #76 Response to Motion, by GS Rio, LP, Greystar Management Company, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, SVF Northshore Austin, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sencenbaugh, Adam)
February 20, 2019 Filing 76 ***STRICKEN PER GAVEL ORDER dated 02/20/2019***RESPONSE to Motion, filed by GS Rio, LP, Greystar Management Company, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, SVF Northshore Austin, LP, re #74 MOTION to Narrow TRO to Allow for Mediation and to Reset th Preliminary Injunction Hearing for All Parties filed by Defendant Stratton Amenities, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sencenbaugh, Adam) Modified on 2/20/2019 (td).
February 19, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE to #69 Order by Jolyne D. Shepard. (td)
February 19, 2019 Filing 75 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by TFC Partners Inc., re #74 MOTION to Narrow TRO to Allow for Mediation and to Reset th Preliminary Injunction Hearing for All Parties filed by Defendant Stratton Amenities, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Narrow TRO to Allow for Mediation and to Reset th Preliminary Injunction Hearing for All Parties by Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trahan, Paul)
February 19, 2019 Filing 73 Sealed Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document Exhibit 63, #3 Sealed Document Exhibit 64) (td)
February 19, 2019 Filing 72 Advisory Regarding Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #55 and #68 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Court notes this corrected certificate of service and affirms, pursuant to the Text Order entered earlier today, that an answer or other responsive pleading for Defendants Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC (Greystar Real Estate), Greystar Management Company (Greystar Management), GS Rio Group, LP d/b/a Seven Apartments (Seven), and SVF Northshore Austin, LP d/b/a Northshore Apartments (Northshore) is now due on or before March 12, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 19, 2019 Filing 71 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by TFC Partners Inc.. (Secco, Marisa)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER to File Notice of Appearance. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER On Status of Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 19, 2019 Filing 68 CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GS Rio, LP, Greystar Management Company, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, SVF Northshore Austin, LP. (Sencenbaugh, Adam)
February 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Benjamin F. Roberts answer due 2/22/2019; Stratton Amenities, LLC answer due 2/22/2019. (td)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #66 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: GS Rio, LP answer due 3/12/2019; Greystar Management Company answer due 3/12/2019; Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC answer due 3/12/2019; SVF Northshore Austin, LP answer due 3/12/2019. (td)
February 19, 2019 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Stratton Amenities, LLC for proceedings held on 02/12/2019. Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference & Show Cause Hearing. Court Reporter: Pamela J. Andasola. (Trahan, Paul)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. An answer or other responsive pleading for Defendants Stratton Amenities, LLC, and Benjamin F. Roberts is now due on or before February 22, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #60 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #58 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. An answer or other responsive pleading for Defendants Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC (Greystar Real Estate), Greystar Management Company (Greystar Management), GS Rio Group, LP d/b/a Seven Apartments (Seven), and SVF Northshore Austin, LP d/b/a Northshore Apartments (Northshore) is now due on or before March 12, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 19, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal - Exhibit F to Stratton's Reply in Support of Advisory and Certificate of Compliance by Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trahan, Paul)
February 19, 2019 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Stratton Amenities, LLC, re #60 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Plaintiff TFC Partners Inc. Reply in Support of Advisory (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Trahan, Paul)
February 19, 2019 Filing 64 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Adam Hugh Sencenbaugh: re #55 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . (td)
February 19, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Scheduling Letter by GS Rio, LP, Greystar Management Company, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, SVF Northshore Austin, LP (Sencenbaugh, Adam)
February 18, 2019 Filing 62 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on February 12, 2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference / Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela J. Andasola, pjandasola@comcast.net, Telephone number: (210) 244-5038. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/11/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2019, (Andasola, Pamela)
February 18, 2019 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Benjamin F. Roberts, Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trahan, Paul)
February 18, 2019 Filing 60 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document - Exhibit A, #3 Sealed Document - Exhibit D, #4 Sealed Document - Exhibit E) (Secco, Marisa)
February 18, 2019 Filing 59 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-E)(Secco, Marisa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2019: #5 Sealed Document Exhibit A, #6 Sealed Document Exhibit D, #7 Sealed Document Exhibit E) (td).
February 16, 2019 Filing 58 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document - Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Sealed Document - Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Sealed Document - Exhibit 63, #5 Sealed Document - Exhibit 64) (Secco, Marisa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 57 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Benjamin F. Roberts, Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Trahan, Paul)
February 15, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Compliance by Jolyne D. Shepard. (cj)
February 15, 2019 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by GS Rio, LP, Greystar Management Company, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, SVF Northshore Austin, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sencenbaugh, Adam)
February 15, 2019 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by TFC Partners Inc. for proceedings held on 2/12/2019. Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference and Show Cause Hearing. Court Reporter: Pamela J. Andasola, CSR/RMR/FCRR. (Secco, Marisa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td)
February 12, 2019 #36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction set for 2/26/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #37 Motion to Extend the TRO. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 12, 2019 Filing 51 EXHIBITS LIST FROM HEARING HELD 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit P#63)(td)
February 12, 2019 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2019 re #37 MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Schedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by TFC Partners Inc. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td)
February 12, 2019 Filing 49 Sealed Document filed. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Application for TRO and Motion to Extend TRO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52 Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 53 Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 54 Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 55 Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 56 Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 57 Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 58 Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 59 Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 60 Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 61 Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 62 Filed Under Seal) (lt)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #48 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Having considered the motion, the Court will grant leave to file the exhibits under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #47 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for the Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Having considered the motion, the Court will grant the leave requested. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #43 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Having considered the motion, the Court will grant leave to file the exhibits under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 12, 2019 Filing 48 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document - Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Its Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Sealed Document - Exhibit 52, #4 Sealed Document - Exhibit 53, #5 Sealed Document - Exhibit 54, #6 Sealed Document - Exhibit 55, #7 Sealed Document - Exhibit 56, #8 Sealed Document - Exhibit 57, #9 Sealed Document - Exhibit 58, #10 Sealed Document - Exhibit 59, #11 Sealed Document - Exhibit 60, #12 Sealed Document - Exhibit 61, #13 Sealed Document - Exhibit 62) (Secco, Marisa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Reply in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Motino to Extend Temporary Restraining Order by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Henson Adams on behalf of GS Rio, LP, Greystar Management Company, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, SVF Northshore Austin, LP. Attorney C. Henson Adams added to party GS Rio, LP(pty:dft), Attorney C. Henson Adams added to party Greystar Management Company(pty:dft), Attorney C. Henson Adams added to party Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney C. Henson Adams added to party SVF Northshore Austin, LP(pty:dft) (Adams, C.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Iris Gibson on behalf of GS Rio, LP, Greystar Management Company, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, SVF Northshore Austin, LP. Attorney J. Iris Gibson added to party GS Rio, LP(pty:dft), Attorney J. Iris Gibson added to party Greystar Management Company(pty:dft), Attorney J. Iris Gibson added to party Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney J. Iris Gibson added to party SVF Northshore Austin, LP(pty:dft) (Gibson, J.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Hugh Sencenbaugh on behalf of GS Rio, LP, Greystar Management Company, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, SVF Northshore Austin, LP. Attorney Adam Hugh Sencenbaugh added to party GS Rio, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Hugh Sencenbaugh added to party Greystar Management Company(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Hugh Sencenbaugh added to party Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Hugh Sencenbaugh added to party SVF Northshore Austin, LP(pty:dft) (Sencenbaugh, Adam)
February 11, 2019 Filing 43 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document - Exhibit 1, #3 Sealed Document - Exhibit 4, #4 Sealed Document - Exhibit 6, #5 Sealed Document - Exhibit 7, #6 Sealed Document - Exhibit 8, #7 Sealed Document - Exhibit 9, #8 Sealed Document - Exhibit 10, #9 Sealed Document - Exhibit 11, #10 Sealed Document - Exhibit 12, #11 Sealed Document - Exhibit 16, #12 Sealed Document - Exhibit 25, #13 Sealed Document - Exhibit 31, #14 Sealed Document - Exhibit 42, #15 Sealed Document - Exhibit 47, #16 Sealed Document - Exhibit 48, #17 Sealed Document - Exhibit 49, #18 Sealed Document - Exhibit 50, #19 Sealed Document - Exhibit 51) (Secco, Marisa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 42 Receipt number 100035139 in the amount of $30,000.00 - TRO Bond Per Court Order #16 filed 1/30/2019. (td)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #35 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Court finds there is good cause to allow excess pages for the motion. The Court cautions the parties that leave to file excess pages will not be granted automatically in this case, and urges the parties to adhere to Local Rules governing page limits unless exceptional circumstances counsel otherwise. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Stratton Amenities, LLC, re #37 MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Schedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Plaintiff TFC Partners Inc. [Response and Opposition] (Attachments: #1 Appendix List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mehdi Tazi, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit A-4, #7 Exhibit A-5, #8 Exhibit A-6, #9 Exhibit A-7, #10 Exhibit A-8, #11 Exhibit A-9, #12 Exhibit A-10, #13 Exhibit A-11, #14 Exhibit A-12, #15 Exhibit A-13, #16 Exhibit A-14, #17 Exhibit A-15, #18 Exhibit A-16, #19 Exhibit A-17, #20 Exhibit A-18, #21 Exhibit A-19, #22 Exhibit A-20, #23 Exhibit A-21, #24 Exhibit A-22, #25 Exhibit A-23, #26 Exhibit A-24, #27 Exhibit A-25, #28 Exhibit A-26, #29 Exhibit A-27, #30 Exhibit A-28, #31 Exhibit B - Declaration of Benjamin Roberts, #32 Exhibit B-1, #33 Exhibit B-2, #34 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jolyene Shepard, #35 Proposed Order)(Trahan, Paul)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 8, 2019 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 2/8/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td)
February 8, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Stratton Amenities, LLC, re #37 MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Schedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Plaintiff TFC Partners Inc. (Trahan, Paul)
February 8, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Schedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
February 8, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit - Declaration of Robert Cancel (Ex. A), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit B - Proposed Reformed Non-Compete Agreements)(Secco, Marisa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2019: #55 Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #56 Sealed Document Exhibit 4, #57 Sealed Document Exhibit 6, #58 Sealed Document Exhibit 7, #59 Sealed Document Exhibit 8, #60 Sealed Document Exhibit 9, #61 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #62 Sealed Document Exhibit 11, #63 Sealed Document Exhibit 12, #64 Sealed Document Exhibit 16, #65 Sealed Document Exhibit 25, #66 Sealed Document Exhibit 31, #67 Sealed Document Exhibit 42, #68 Sealed Document Exhibit 47, #69 Sealed Document Exhibit 48, #70 Sealed Document Exhibit 49, #71 Sealed Document Exhibit 50, #72 Sealed Document Exhibit 51) (td).
February 8, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Motion for Preliminary Injunction by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
February 7, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TFC Partners Inc.. - Amended Return for Saira Escamilla Ruiz (Secco, Marisa)
February 7, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TFC Partners Inc.. Saira Escamilla Ruiz served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Secco, Marisa)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 2/8/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 6, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TFC Partners Inc.. Greystar Management Company served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Secco, Marisa)
February 6, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TFC Partners Inc.. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Secco, Marisa)
February 6, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed (green card not stamped and/or signed) by TFC Partners Inc.. SVF Northshore Austin, LP served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Secco, Marisa) Modified on 2/7/2019 (td).
February 6, 2019 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Agreed Confidentiality by Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trahan, Paul)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion for Substitute Service. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 5, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Substitute Service as to Defendant Saira Escamilla Ruiz by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Process Server, #2 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 4, 2019 Filing 24 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TFC Partners Inc., re #22 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Defendant Stratton Amenities, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
February 2, 2019 Filing 23 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on January 28 2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephone Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela J. Andasola, pjandasola@comcast.net, Telephone number: (210) 244-5038. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 2/25/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2019, (Andasola, Pamela)
February 1, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trahan, Paul)
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stratton Amenities, LLC. (Trahan, Paul)
February 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Trahan on behalf of Stratton Amenities, LLC. Attorney Paul Trahan added to party Stratton Amenities, LLC(pty:dft) (Trahan, Paul)
January 31, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TFC Partners Inc.. Stratton Amenities, LLC served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/18/2019. (Secco, Marisa)
January 31, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TFC Partners Inc.. Benjamin F. Roberts served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Secco, Marisa)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #15 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 30, 2019 Set Hearings: Show Cause Hearing on TRO set for 2/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman; Status Conference for all parties, including those defendants not subject to the TRO entered, set for 2/12/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING IN PART NFC's #7 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Discovery - for Expedited Discovery by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
January 28, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Supplemental Declaration of Robert Cancel by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 46, #2 Exhibit 47, #3 Exhibit 48)(Secco, Marisa)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 1/28/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TFC Partners Inc.. Jolyne D. Shepard served on 1/26/2019, answer due 2/18/2019. (Secco, Marisa)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Luanne Peterpaul. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Justin Kolbenschlag. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
January 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marisa S. Secco for Luanne Peterpaul ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11688077) by on behalf of TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marisa S. Secco for Justin Kolbenschlag ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11687883) by on behalf of TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Secco, Marisa)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit - Declaration of Robert Cancel, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45)(Secco, Marisa)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. (td)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TFC Partners Inc.. (Secco, Marisa)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GS Rio, LP, Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, Benjamin F. Roberts, Saira Escamilla Ruiz, SVF Northshore Austin, LP, Jolyne D. Shepard. (afd)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letters to Luanne Peterpaul and Justin Kolbenschlag. Sent via e-mail 1/25/2019. (afd)
January 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TFC Partners Inc.. (Secco, Marisa)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11682874), filed by TFC Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Secco, Marisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TFC Partners Inc. v. Stratton Amenities, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Company
Represented By: Adam Hugh Sencenbaugh
Represented By: C. Henson Adams
Represented By: J. Iris Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SVF Northshore Austin, LP
Represented By: Adam Hugh Sencenbaugh
Represented By: C. Henson Adams
Represented By: J. Iris Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Represented By: Adam Hugh Sencenbaugh
Represented By: C. Henson Adams
Represented By: J. Iris Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolyne D. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Rio, LP
Represented By: Adam Hugh Sencenbaugh
Represented By: C. Henson Adams
Represented By: J. Iris Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Stratton Amenities, LLC
Represented By: Paul Trahan
Represented By: Ryan Eric Meltzer
Represented By: Jason K. Fagelman
Represented By: Ryan Sellars Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Benjamin F. Roberts
Represented By: Jason K. Fagelman
Represented By: Ryan Sellars Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Saira Escamilla Ruiz
Represented By: Paul Trahan
Represented By: Ryan Eric Meltzer
Represented By: Jason K. Fagelman
Represented By: Ryan Sellars Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TFC Partners Inc.
Represented By: Marisa S. Secco
Represented By: Luanne Peterpaul
Represented By: Justin Kolbenschlag
Represented By: Michelle K. Arishita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?