Battles et al v. Dearborn National Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: John Henry Battles, III and Christine Diane Battles
Defendant: Dearborn National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00078
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Motion For Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Christine Diane Battles, John Henry Battles, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Runkle, Ryan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Christopher Runkle, Justin Edward Dunlap on behalf of Christine Diane Battles, John Henry Battles, III. (td)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company (MacRae, Andrew)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Austin Shell. (afd)
February 1, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Christine Diane Battles, John Henry Battles, III. (afd)
February 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (MacRae, Andrew)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11711743), filed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(MacRae, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/1/2019) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battles et al v. Dearborn National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dearborn National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew F. MacRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Henry Battles, III
Represented By: Eddie G. Shell
Represented By: Justin Edward Dunlap
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Runkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Diane Battles
Represented By: Eddie G. Shell
Represented By: Justin Edward Dunlap
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Runkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?