United States of America v. McGuinn et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Larry D. McGuinn, Propel Financial Services, LLC and Patricia A. McGuinn
Case Number: 1:2019cv00098
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Parties by Larry D. McGuinn, Patricia A. McGuinn. (Jackson, Robert)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Propel Financial Services, LLC. (Shirley, C.)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 Propel FInancial Services, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney C. Wilson Shirley, III added to party Propel Financial Services, LLC(pty:dft) by Propel Financial Services, LLC.(Shirley, C.)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance with Pro Hoc Vice Requirements by Larry D. McGuinn, Patricia A. McGuinn re #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Jackson, Robert)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert B. Jackson. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Larry D. McGuinn, Patricia A. McGuinn.(td)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert B. Jackson (Filing fee $100 receipt number 100035331) on behalf of Larry D. McGuinn, Patricia A. McGuinn. (td)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Propel Financial Services, LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Yepuri, Moha)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Larry D. McGuinn, Patricia A. McGuinn, Propel Financial Services, LLC. (cj)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. for Propel Financial Services, LLC (Yepuri, Moha) (Main Document 4 replaced and flattened on 2/7/2019) (cj).
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. for Patricia A. McGuinn (Yepuri, Moha) (Main Document 3 replaced and flattened on 2/7/2019) (cj).
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. for Larry D. McGuinn (Yepuri, Moha) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 2/7/2019) (cj).
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400 waived.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yepuri, Moha) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 2/7/2019) (cj).
February 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. McGuinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry D. McGuinn
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Propel Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: C. Wilson Shirley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. McGuinn
Represented By: Robert B. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Moha P. Yepuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?