Parker v. Maxwell-NII, Inc.
Plaintiff: Janice Parker
Defendant: Maxwell-NII, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00167
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Maxwell-NII, Inc.. (Kumpf, Tara)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Maxwell-NII, Inc..(Kumpf, Tara)
March 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Maxwell-NII, Inc. answer due 3/21/2019. (td)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or to otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and includes March 21, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Maxwell-NII, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kumpf, Tara)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janice Parker. Maxwell-NII, Inc. served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Langenfeld, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Maxwell-NII, Inc.. (afd)
February 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Janice Parker. (afd)
February 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Janice Parker. (Langenfeld, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11782032). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Janice Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langenfeld, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Maxwell-NII, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxwell-NII, Inc.
Represented By: Erika L. Leonard
Represented By: Tara Moriarty Kumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Parker
Represented By: David G. Langenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?