Emery v. Zavala et al
Plaintiff: Janet E. Emery
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Angela Zavala and Albertelli Law
Case Number: 1:2019cv00185
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Lane
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to the April 3, 2019 Order and Proof of Service to #9 Order by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Clark, Erin)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 The court ORDERS Defendant Bank of America, N.A. to file proof of service or attempted service of the motion on the Plaintiff with the court within ten days of this order. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (dm)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Mark Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ah)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Timothy Wells by Albertelli Law, Angela Zavala.. Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Jacocks, Coury)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Clark, Erin)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to Civil Cover Sheet by Bank of America, N.A.. (Clark, Erin)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Directing Timothy Wells to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
February 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Bank of America, N.A.. (Clark, Erin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America, N.A. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11811947), filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clark, Erin) (Main Document 1 and Attachment 1 replaced on 2/27/2019 to flatten images) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emery v. Zavala et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Erin E. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Zavala
Represented By: Timothy E. Wells
Represented By: Coury M. Jacocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertelli Law
Represented By: Timothy E. Wells
Represented By: Coury M. Jacocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet E. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?