Barragan et al v. Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cameron Barragan and Diamond Price
Defendant: Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00217
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #14 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Unopposed MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Amy M. Stewart . Filer selected wrong event, correction has been made. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td)
April 25, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Order re: #13 Unopposed MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Amy M. Stewart by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Clements, Merritt) Modified on 4/25/2019 to correct event (td).
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Amy M. Stewart by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Clements, Merritt)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Merritt M. Clements on behalf of Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Merritt M. Clements added to party Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Clements, Merritt)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Alexander Begum is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiffs. The record shall reflect that he no longer represents Plaintiffs in this action. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alexander Begum by Cameron Barragan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Pl. Motion for Leave)(Lopez, Julian)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 Case Transfer and Opening Letters mailed to Alexander Begum, Julian T. Lopez, and Amy M. Stewart. (cj)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Directing Alexander Begum to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
March 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cameron Barragan, Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, Diamond Price. (cj)
March 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred in from Northern District of Texas; Case Number 3:19-cv-00324.
March 6, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Mar 6 15:19:03 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/6/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Agreed MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Venue. The Court finds that transfer is proper and the Agreed Motion is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Austin Division. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/6/2019) (aaa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/6/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Agreed MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Venue filed by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company (Stewart, Amy) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/6/2019.]
February 13, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed Feb 13 12:37:42 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/6/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 3/6/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/13/2019) (aaa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/6/2019.]
February 11, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Mon Feb 11 11:52:14 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/6/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/6/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Stewart, Amy) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/6/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 162nd District Court, Dallas County, TX, case number DC-18-18061 filed by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9768265) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit B) (Stewart, Amy) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barragan et al v. Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Barragan
Represented By: Julian T. Lopez
Represented By: Alexander Begum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Price
Represented By: Julian T. Lopez
Represented By: Alexander Begum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy M. Stewart
Represented By: Merritt M. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?