Shine v. Ocwen Land Servicing LLC

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Shine
Defendant: Ocwen Land Servicing LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00486
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 The Court ORDERS that this action is STAYED until July 15, 2019. Plaintiff shall either file a stipulation of dismissal or a motion to extend the stay no later than July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Ocwen Land Servicing LLC (Sachnik, Gregory)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before June 18, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dg)
May 30, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #10 Certificate of Service. ***PLEASE NOTE: Not all attorneys are registered for electronic noticing therefore they will NOT be served via CM/ECF. (dm)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elizabeth Shine #9 Deficiency Notice, #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Zimmer, Robert)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss (dm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Elizabeth Shine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zimmer, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew M. Petersen. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory J. Sachnik ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12129672) by Matthew M. Peterson on behalf of Ocwen Land Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sachnik, Gregory)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Ocwen Land Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sachnik, Gregory)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Directing Matthew Peterson to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
May 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 ATTACHMENT Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Notice of Removal by Ocwen Land Servicing LLC. (Sachnik, Gregory)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Land Servicing LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12077434), filed by Ocwen Land Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sachnik, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shine v. Ocwen Land Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Shine
Represented By: Robert Alan Zimmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Land Servicing LLC
Represented By: Matthew Peterson
Represented By: Gregory J. Sachnik
Represented By: Matthew Michael Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?