Ogunlade v. Watts et al
Plaintiff: Tolulope Ogunlade
Defendant: James Watts and Elite Trucking Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00487
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tolulope Ogunlade. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(James, Benedict)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Holtzman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Holtzman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12123282) by on behalf of Tolulope Ogunlade. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(James, Benedict) Modified on 5/17/2019 (td).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Directing Esteban Sandoval and Jack Holtzman to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
May 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Elite Trucking Services LLC, Tolulope Ogunlade, James Watts. (dl)
May 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Elite Trucking Services LLC, James Watts. (Dijkman, Christiana) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/6/2019 to flatten image) (dl).
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Supplement to JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Elite Trucking Services LLC, James Watts. (Dijkman, Christiana) Modified on 5/6/2019 to correct document type (dl).
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Elite Trucking Services LLC, James Watts (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12078826), filed by Elite Trucking Services LLC, James Watts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Dijkman, Christiana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ogunlade v. Watts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Watts
Represented By: Christiana Dijkman
Represented By: Rodney E. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Trucking Services LLC
Represented By: Christiana Dijkman
Represented By: Rodney E. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tolulope Ogunlade
Represented By: Benedict Vladislav James
Represented By: Esteban Sandoval
Represented By: Jack Holtzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?