American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc. v. Bowersock et al

Plaintiff: American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc.
Defendant: Arien Bowersock and The Home Loan Expert
Case Number: 1:2019cv00492
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING #26 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
June 14, 2019 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Arien Bowersock, The Home Loan Expert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dow, Matt)
May 30, 2019 Filing 32 Transcript filed of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Proceedings held on May 16, 2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela J. Andasola, Telephone number: (210) 244-5038 pjandasola@comcast.net. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/20/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2019, (pa)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Setting Preliminary Injunction Hearing, ( Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/19/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman,). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
May 29, 2019 Filing 30 Proposed Pretrial Order Denying Plaintiffs Motion for Clarification and/or Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Pertaining to Section 5, Paragraphs A and B of Bowersocks Employment Agreement by Arien Bowersock, The Home Loan Expert. (Romero, Joshua)
May 29, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 5/29/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(afd)
May 29, 2019 Filing 28 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #27 Response to Motion, (afd)
May 29, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Arien Bowersock, The Home Loan Expert, re #26 MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Order on Motion for TRO and/or Clarification of Order Denying Motion for TRO Pertaining to Section 5, Paragraphs A and B of Bowersock's Employment Agreement filed by Plaintiff American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc. (Romero, Joshua)
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Order on Motion for TRO and/or Clarification of Order Denying Motion for TRO Pertaining to Section 5, Paragraphs A and B of Bowersock's Employment Agreement by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kamins, Scott)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, ( Telephone Conference set for 5/29/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman,). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING #8 Motion for TRO Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
May 23, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Home Loan Expert, Arien Bowersock as to All Defendants. (Dow, Matt)
May 23, 2019 Filing 22 EXHIBITS for #21 Motion Hearing held on 5/23/2019 by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc., Arien Bowersock, The Home Loan Expert. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Exhibits, #2 Plaintiff's Exhibits)(afd)
May 23, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Motion Hearing held on 5/23/2019 re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants filed by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(afd)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
May 23, 2019 Filing 20 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #18 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc.. (Kamins, Scott)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Scott V. Kamins: re #18 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (td)
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc.. (Kamins, Scott)
May 22, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support, filed by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc., re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants filed by Plaintiff American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc. (Kamins, Scott)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 Witness List from TRO hearing held 5/16/2019. (td)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE that Motions are Unopposed by Arien Bowersock, The Home Loan Expert re #12 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dow, Matt)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Motion Hearing held on 5/16/2019 re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants filed by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF regarding #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants by Arien Bowersock, The Home Loan Expert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Arien Bowersock)(Dow, Matt)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation in Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Arien Bowersock, The Home Loan Expert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Dow, Matt)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Motion Hearing for #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants ( Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Robert Pitman,). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc.. (Kamins, Scott)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants (afd)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kamins, Scott)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; DENYING #4 Motion for TRO Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER for #3 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc.. (afd)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(dl)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Application for TRO and Preliminary Injuction, #2 Proposed Order)(dl)
May 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc.. (dl)
May 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Scott V. Kamins ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100035834) by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(dl)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 100035833), filed by American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc. v. Bowersock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Mortgage & Equity Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: Scott V. Kamins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arien Bowersock
Represented By: Scott W. Weatherford
Represented By: Matt Dow
Represented By: Joshua A. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Loan Expert
Represented By: Scott W. Weatherford
Represented By: Matt Dow
Represented By: Joshua A. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?