Service Lloyds Insurance Company v. North American Risk Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Service Lloyds Insurance Company
Counter Plaintiff: North American Risk Services, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Tee & Gee Group, LLC, CoreCare Management and Prime Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00518
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Diane P. Dawley. (td)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #9 Complaint . Attorney Josh K. Davis added to party CoreCare Management(pty:3pd) by CoreCare Management.(Davis, Josh)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 Original ANSWER to #9 Complaint Counterclaim by Service Lloyds Insurance Company.(Icenogle, Anthony)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Risk Services, Inc.. Prime Health Services, Inc. served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Schexnayder, Martin) Modified to correct party served on 6/6/2019 (td).
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Risk Services, Inc. Tee & Gee Group served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Schexnayder, Martin) Modified on 5/30/2019 (td).
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to CoreCare Management, Prime Health Services, Inc., Tee & Gee Group, LLC. (td)
May 20, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #9 Third-Party Complaint. This document should have been filed in the traditional manner. Because the document is already on file, we will download and print the required paper copy for the Court. Please review the Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, Western District of Texas, Section 5, page 9. (td)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by North American Risk Services, Inc.. (Schexnayder, Martin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 COMPLAINT Third Party Complaint, filed by North American Risk Services, Inc..(Schexnayder, Martin)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
May 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by North American Risk Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Schexnayder, Martin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by North American Risk Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Schexnayder, Martin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by North American Risk Services, Inc. (Schexnayder, Martin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by North American Risk Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Schexnayder, Martin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by North American Risk Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Schexnayder, Martin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by North American Risk Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Schexnayder, Martin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by North American Risk Services, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12108694), filed by North American Risk Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schexnayder, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Service Lloyds Insurance Company v. North American Risk Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: North American Risk Services, Inc.
Represented By: Martin S. Schexnayder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Lloyds Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony Lee Icenogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Tee & Gee Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CoreCare Management
Represented By: Josh K. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Prime Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?