Texas Mutual Insurance v. Kinsale Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Texas Mutual Insurance
Defendant: Kinsale Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00529
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 CORRECTED ANSWER to Complaint by Kinsale Insurance Company.(Cordova, Andres)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Kinsale Insurance Company.(Cordova, Andres)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Andres Cordova to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Kinsale Insurance Company. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Sina Bahadoran to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kinsale Insurance Company. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lisa M. Henderson for Andres Cordova ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12163729) by on behalf of Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henderson, Lisa) Modified on 5/29/2019 (lt).
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lisa M. Henderson for Sina Bahadoran ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12163574) by on behalf of Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henderson, Lisa) Modified on 5/29/2019 (lt).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint; Kinsale Insurance Company answer due 6/10/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
May 21, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #8 Supplement. Under the Court's Local Rules and its Administrative Policies & Procedures for Electronic Filing, all documents must be double-spaced. No further action is required at this time; please take note for future filing purposes. (lt)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Henderson, Lisa)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #6 Attachment (lt)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT Court Docket to #1 Notice of Removal by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Henderson, Lisa)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kinsale Insurance Company #1 Notice of Removal (Henderson, Lisa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Kinsale Insurance Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henderson, Lisa)
May 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Henderson, Lisa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kinsale Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12120315), filed by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(Henderson, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Mutual Insurance v. Kinsale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Mutual Insurance
Represented By: R. Scott Placek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinsale Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa M. Henderson
Represented By: Andres Cordova
Represented By: Sina Bahadoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?