Baisley v. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Plaintiff: Arthur Baisley
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Case Number: 1:2019cv00531
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE -- Acknowledgement of Plaintiff's Notice of Claim of Unconstitutionality to #2 Notice (Other) by United States of America. (Kolsky, Joshua)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arthur Baisley Amended #19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Jennings, Jeffrey)
July 5, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Arthur Baisley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jennings, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth A. Roma. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John J. Grunert. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Quinto-Pozos, Manuel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Parties ("Corporate Disclosure Statement") by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (Quinto-Pozos, Manuel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Manuel Alfonso Quinto-Pozos for Attorney John J. Grunert ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12307893) by on behalf of International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to PHV Applic, #2 Proposed Order)(Quinto-Pozos, Manuel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Manuel Alfonso Quinto-Pozos for Attorney Elizabeth A. Roma ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12307865) by on behalf of International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to PHV App, #2 Proposed Order)(Quinto-Pozos, Manuel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Manuel Alfonso Quinto-Pozos for Martha Owen on behalf of International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers (Quinto-Pozos, Manuel) Modified on 7/3/2019 to include name(afd).
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Manuel Alfonso Quinto-Pozos on behalf of International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. Attorney Manuel Alfonso Quinto-Pozos added to party International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers(pty:dft) (Quinto-Pozos, Manuel)
June 12, 2019 Set Answer Deadlines: 07/02/2019 (afd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Baisley. All Defendants. (Jennings, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Milton L. Chappell . Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey D. Jennings. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason E. Winford for Jeffrey D. Jennings ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12170649) by on behalf of Arthur Baisley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winford, Jason)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason E. Winford for Milton L. Chappell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12170402) by on behalf of Arthur Baisley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Winford, Jason)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers. (afd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Arthur Baisley. (Winford, Jason)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Jeffrey Jennings and Milton Chappell. (dl)
May 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Claim of Unconstitutionality by Arthur Baisley (Winford, Jason)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12122755). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Arthur Baisley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Winford, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baisley v. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Baisley
Represented By: Jason E. Winford
Represented By: David E. Watkins
Represented By: Milton L. Chappell
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Represented By: John J. Grunert
Represented By: Martha Powell Owen
Represented By: Manuel Alfonso Quinto-Pozos
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?