Longoria v. Emerson Electric Co. et al

Plaintiff: Claudia Longoria
Defendant: Sunil Solanke and Emerson Electric Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00534
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT 2nd amended against All Defendants amending #4 Amended Complaint., filed by Claudia Longoria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Written Consent)(Wolcott, Craig)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Amended NOTICE of Removal by Emerson Electric Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Emerson Electric Co..(cj)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING #7 Motion to Remand to State Court Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Shaw, Ethan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Ethan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Emerson Electric Co., re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Claudia Longoria (Shaw, Ethan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Claudia Longoria. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Pltf Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wolcott, Craig)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sunil Solanke. (cj)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Claudia Longoria. (Wolcott, Craig)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Claudia Longoria.(Wolcott, Craig)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Emerson Electric Co.. (Shaw, Ethan)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
May 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Emerson Electric Co., Claudia Longoria. (cj)
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Emerson Electric Co. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12130147), filed by Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaw, Ethan) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 5/20/2019) (cj). (Attachment 2 replaced and flattened on 5/20/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longoria v. Emerson Electric Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Longoria
Represented By: Craig Stephen Wolcott
Represented By: Thomas J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunil Solanke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.
Represented By: Ethan L. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?