Hill Country Emergency Medical Associates, P.A. et al v. UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Emergency Associates of Central Texas, P.A., Hill Country Emergency Medical Associates, P.A., Central Texas Emergency Associates, P.A. and Longhorn Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A.
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company and UnitedHealthCare of Texas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00548
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The parties' deadline to file a joint proposed scheduling order in accordance with this Court's Local Rules, and their deadline to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f), is extended to and includes the seventh day after the Court's resolution of Plaintiff's motion to remand. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' motion to remand is extended to and includes July 25, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Colleluori, Donald)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Written Discovery Plan by Central Texas Emergency Associates, P.A., Emergency Associates of Central Texas, P.A., Hill Country Emergency Medical Associates, P.A., Longhorn Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eckinger, Helen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Central Texas Emergency Associates, P.A., Emergency Associates of Central Texas, P.A., Hill Country Emergency Medical Associates, P.A., Longhorn Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eckinger, Helen)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Helen Eckinger. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rick Harrison (for Helen Eckinger) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12209014) by on behalf of Central Texas Emergency Associates, P.A., Emergency Associates of Central Texas, P.A., Hill Country Emergency Medical Associates, P.A., Longhorn Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Rick)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Donald Colleluori. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Larry Childs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rick Harrison for Larry B. Childs ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12165933) by on behalf of Central Texas Emergency Associates, P.A., Emergency Associates of Central Texas, P.A., Hill Country Emergency Medical Associates, P.A., Longhorn Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Rick)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew G. Jubinsky for Donald Colleluori ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12160868) by on behalf of UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jubinsky, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Directing Larry Childs, Donald Colleluori, and Helen L. Eckinger to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
May 24, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Central Texas Emergency Associates, P.A., Emergency Associates of Central Texas, P.A., Hill Country Emergency Medical Associates, P.A., Longhorn Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A.. (cj)
May 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet by UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthCare of Texas, Inc.. (Jubinsky, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc.. (Jubinsky, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12152510), filed by UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court File)(Jubinsky, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill Country Emergency Medical Associates, P.A. et al v. UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergency Associates of Central Texas, P.A.
Represented By: Helen Eckinger
Represented By: Rick Harrison
Represented By: Jamie Adele McGonigal
Represented By: Larry Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hill Country Emergency Medical Associates, P.A.
Represented By: Helen Eckinger
Represented By: Rick Harrison
Represented By: Jamie Adele McGonigal
Represented By: Larry Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Texas Emergency Associates, P.A.
Represented By: Helen Eckinger
Represented By: Rick Harrison
Represented By: Jamie Adele McGonigal
Represented By: Larry Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longhorn Emergency Medicine Associates, P.A.
Represented By: Helen Eckinger
Represented By: Rick Harrison
Represented By: Jamie Adele McGonigal
Represented By: Larry Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew G. Jubinsky
Represented By: Donald Colleluori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G. Jubinsky
Represented By: Donald Colleluori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?