Arnold v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jessica Arnold
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00558
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER WITHDRAWING #12 Order Referring Motions to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Allstate's Motion to Dismiss filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jessica Arnold. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Susan Hightower. (td)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Allstate's Motion to Dismiss filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jessica Arnold. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Jessica Arnold (dm)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to File Response to Motion Out of Time. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Allstate's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (slip opinion))(Cuellar, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand), #2 Proposed Order)(Cuellar, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT Subject to Motion to Remand, filed by Jessica Arnold.(Dunaway, Aspen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jessica Arnold, re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Allstate's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Dunaway, Aspen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jessica Arnold. (Dunaway, Aspen)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Cuellar, Joseph)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Allstate's Motion to Dismiss by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Valdez, Robert)
May 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12164918), filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Cuellar, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Represented By: Joseph Edward Cuellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Arnold
Represented By: Aspen James Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?