Central Texas Highway Constructors, LLC et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA

Plaintiff: Cintra Infrasturctures SE, Ferrovial SA, Ferrovial Agroman US Corp., Central Texas Highway Constructors, LLC, Cintra Holding US Corp, Ferrovial US Construction Corp, Ferrovial Agroman SA, Ferrovial Holding US Corp, Ferrovial S.A., Cintra Infrastructures, S.E., Ferrovial Agroman S.A., Ferrovial Holding U.S. Corp., Cintra Holding U.S. Corp., Ferrovial Agroman U.S. Corp. and Ferrovial U.S. Construction Corp.
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00570
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Cindy M. Dinh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA answer due 8/9/2019. (lt)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due on or before August 9, 2019. The Court's prior order that Plaintiff shall move for entry of default and default judgment, (Dkt. 10), is now MOOT. The Court is satisfied that Defendant is not in default at this time because Defendant is now participating in this case. However, the Court will maintain the order on its docket as an accurate record of the proceedings in this case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert S. Harrell re Cindy Dinh ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12300284) by on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Cindy Dinh)(Harrell, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to Attorney Cindy Dinh re: non-admitted status. (lt)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Motion for Extension of Time)(Harrell, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Plaintiffs shall move for entry of default and default judgment against Defendant on or before July 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Case Transfer and Opening Letter sent to Peter D. Luan and Micah E. Skidmore. (cj)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Directing Peter D. Luan to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
June 3, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Central Texas Highway Constructors, LLC, Cintra Holding U.S. Corp., Cintra Infrastructures, S.E., Ferrovial Agroman S.A., Ferrovial Agroman U.S. Corp., Ferrovial Holding U.S. Corp., Ferrovial S.A., Ferrovial U.S. Construction Corp.. (dl)
June 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred in from Northern District of Texas; Case Number 3:19-cv-01135.
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court finds that this case has a stronger connection to the Western District of Texas, Austin Division. Accordingly, on the Court's own motion, this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Austin Division. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/3/2019) (aaa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/3/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA; served on 5/20/2019. (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/3/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Plaintiffs Central Texas Highway Constructors LLC, Cintra Holding US Corp, Cintra Infrasturctures SE, Ferrovial Agroman SA, Ferrovial Agroman US Corp, Ferrovial Holding US Corp, Ferrovial SA, Ferrovial US Construction Corp. (Skidmore, Micah) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/3/2019.]
May 14, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Tue May 14 08:58:43 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/3/2019.]
May 14, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Tue May 14 08:58:25 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/3/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/3/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/3/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA filed by Ferrovial Agroman US Corp, Cintra Holding US Corp, Ferrovial Holding US Corp, Central Texas Highway Constructors LLC, Ferrovial Agroman SA, Cintra Infrasturctures SE, Ferrovial SA, Ferrovial US Construction Corp. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9980947) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Skidmore, Micah) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Texas Highway Constructors, LLC et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cintra Infrasturctures SE
Represented By: Peter David Laun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrovial SA
Represented By: Micah E. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrovial Agroman US Corp.
Represented By: Micah E. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Texas Highway Constructors, LLC
Represented By: Micah E. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cintra Holding US Corp
Represented By: Peter David Laun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrovial US Construction Corp
Represented By: Micah E. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrovial Agroman SA
Represented By: Micah E. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrovial Holding US Corp
Represented By: Micah E. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrovial S.A.
Represented By: Micah E. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cintra Infrastructures, S.E.
Represented By: Peter D. Laun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrovial Agroman S.A.
Represented By: Micah E. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrovial Holding U.S. Corp.
Represented By: Micah E. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cintra Holding U.S. Corp.
Represented By: Peter D. Laun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrovial Agroman U.S. Corp.
Represented By: Micah E. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrovial U.S. Construction Corp.
Represented By: Micah E. Skidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Cindy M. Dinh
Represented By: Andrew Chafic Elkhoury
Represented By: Robert S. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?