Sport Clips, Inc. v. Zotian et al
Plaintiff: Sport Clips, Inc. and Sports Clips, Inc.
Defendant: Gregory H Zotian, Susan G Zotian, Zote Enterprises, Inc., Gregory H. Zotian and Susan G. Zotian
Case Number: 1:2019cv00580
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sports Clips, Inc. (Taylor, Deborah)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition. ORDER that Defendants shall have until August 2, 2019, to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Zote Enterprises, Inc., Gregory H. Zotian, Susan G. Zotian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cherry, Craig)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Evan M. Goldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendants. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Craig D. Cherry for Evan M. Goldman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12237810) by on behalf of Zote Enterprises, Inc., Gregory H. Zotian, Susan G. Zotian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cherry, Craig)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT State Court Filing by Zote Enterprises, Inc., Gregory H. Zotian, Susan G. Zotian. (Attachments: #1 Supplement First Amended Original Petition, #2 Supplement State Court Docket Sheet)(Cherry, Craig)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Zote Enterprises, Inc., Gregory H. Zotian, Susan G. Zotian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cherry, Craig)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Directing Evan M. Goldman to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
June 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zote Enterprises, Inc., Susan G Zotian, Gregory H Zotian (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12194878), filed by Zote Enterprises, Inc., Susan G Zotian, Gregory H Zotian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Cherry, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sport Clips, Inc. v. Zotian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory H Zotian
Represented By: Craig D. Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan G Zotian
Represented By: Craig D. Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zote Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Craig D. Cherry
Represented By: Evan M. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory H. Zotian
Represented By: Evan M. Goldman
Represented By: Craig D. Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan G. Zotian
Represented By: Evan M. Goldman
Represented By: Craig D. Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sport Clips, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sports Clips, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?