Rebold v. United States of America
Plaintiff: John H. Rebold
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00607
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John H. Rebold. United States Of America served on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Erwin, Joseph)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John H. Rebold. to USA WD Texas (Erwin, Joseph)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John H. Rebold. United States Of America served on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Erwin, Joseph)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Joseph M. Erwin; Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 100036295. (td)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States Of America, U.S. Attorney General (lt)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Joseph M. Erwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John H. Rebold. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph M. Erwin on behalf of John H. Rebold. (dl)
June 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John H. Rebold. (cj)
June 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Joseph M. Erwin regarding non-admitted status. (dl)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Of America. (dl)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 100036130), filed by John H. Rebold. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Envelope, #7 Receipt)(dl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rebold v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H. Rebold
Represented By: Joseph M. Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?