NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc. et al v. Paxton et al
Plaintiff: NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., Lone Star Transmission LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC and Lone Star Transmission, LLC
Defendant: Arthur C. D'Andrea, Shelly Botkin, Ken Paxton, Chairman DeAnn T. Walker, Commissioner Shelly Botkin and Commissioner Arthur C. D'Andrea
Petitioner: Entergy Services, LLC, Texas Industrial Energy Consumers, Entergy Texas, Inc., Southwestern Public Service Company and LSP Transmission Holdings II, LLC.
Intervenor: Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00626
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 142 ATTACHMENT proposed order to #140 MOTION for Hearing for a Status Conference by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2020 Filing 141 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #140 MOTION for Hearing for a Status Conference (dm)
February 13, 2020 Filing 140 MOTION for Hearing for a Status Conference by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2020 Filing 139 NOTICE [Joint] Concerning Status by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NextEra, #2 Exhibit Texas)(Tillotson, Jeffrey)
December 23, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE Interim Joint Notice Concerning Status by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2019 Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, DeAnn T. Walker for proceedings held on 12/4/2019. Proceedings Transcribed: 12/4/2019. Court Reporter: Arlinda Rodriguez. (Myers, H.)
December 12, 2019 Filing 136 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Entergy Texas, Inc. for proceedings held on 12/4/19. Proceedings Transcribed: 12/4/19. Court Reporter: Arlinda Rodriguez. (Boldt, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 135 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on December 4, 2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Motions Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/2/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2020, (alr)
December 4, 2019 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2019 re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by DeAnn T. Walker, Arthur C. D'Andrea, Shelly Botkin (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(dm)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING #131 Motion for Tabitha J. De Paulo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of LSP Transmission Holdings II,LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER DENYING #125 Opposed Motion of the United States to Participate in the December 4 Hearing. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
November 27, 2019 Filing 131 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth A. Young Tabitha J. De Paulo ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12901565) by on behalf of LSP Transmission Holdings II, LLC.. (Young, Kenneth)
November 26, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE Reply In Support by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC re #123 Notice (Other), (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2019 Filing 129 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, DeAnn T. Walker, re #125 Opposed MOTION for Hearing re #121 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Set Motion Hearings,, filed by Amicus United States of America (Hulme, John)
November 22, 2019 Filing 128 RESPONSE to NextEra's Request for Imminent Relief to #123 Notice (Other), by Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, DeAnn T. Walker. (Hulme, John)
November 18, 2019 Filing 127 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #125 Opposed MOTION for Hearing re #121 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Set Motion Hearings,, by United States of America. (Mandelberg, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 126 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #125 Opposed MOTION for Hearing re #121 Order. (dm)
November 15, 2019 Filing 125 Opposed MOTION for Hearing re #121 Order, Set Motion Hearings, by United States of America. (Mandelberg, Matthew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 124 ATTACHMENT A to #123 Notice (Other), by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tillotson, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE of Request for Imminent Relief by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2019 Filing 122 RESPONSE to Statement of Interest of the United States to #110 Response to Motion, by Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, DeAnn T. Walker. (Hulme, John)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER, GRANTING #117 MOTION for Hearing re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC., Set Motion Hearing for #94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) ( Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel,). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING #112 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 8, 2019 Filing 119 ATTACHMENT to #117 MOTION for Hearing re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Filing 118 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #117 MOTION for Hearing re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) (dm)
October 8, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION for Hearing re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING #115 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 115 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Max Minzner by Southwestern Public Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Price, Matthew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE by United States of America re #112 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Statement of Interest (Mandelberg, Matthew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 113 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, re #112 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Statement of Interest filed by Defendant DeAnn T. Walker, Defendant Arthur C. D'Andrea, Defendant Shelly Botkin (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 112 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Statement of Interest by Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, DeAnn T. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hulme, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, DeAnn T. Walker, re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant DeAnn T. Walker, Defendant Arthur C. D'Andrea, Defendant Shelly Botkin (Hulme, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 110 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by United States of America, re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant DeAnn T. Walker, Defendant Arthur C. D'Andrea, Defendant Shelly Botkin (Mandelberg, Matthew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew C. Mandelberg on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Matthew C. Mandelberg added to party United States of America(pty:am) (Mandelberg, Matthew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 108 AMENDED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, re #104 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Plaintiff NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, Plaintiff Lone Star Transmission, LLC, Plaintiff NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, Plaintiff NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, #94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant DeAnn T. Walker, Defendant Arthur C. D'Andrea, Defendant Shelly Botkin (Tillotson, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/17/2019 (dm).
September 16, 2019 Filing 107 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant DeAnn T. Walker, Defendant Arthur C. D'Andrea, Defendant Shelly Botkin (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING #104 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 105 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on August 28, 2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephone Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 9/25/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/7/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2019, (alr)
September 3, 2019 Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tillotson, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2019 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Southwestern Public Service Company for proceedings held on 08/28/2019. Proceedings Transcribed: Telephone Conference. Court Reporter: Arlinda Rodriguez. (Price, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 IT IS ORDERED the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction scheduled for September 10, 2019, at 9:00 a.m., is CANCELED pending further order of the court. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Entergy Texas, Inc. for proceedings held on 8/28/2019.. (Garza, Catherine)
August 29, 2019 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC for proceedings held on 8-27-2019. Proceedings Transcribed: 08-27-19. Court Reporter: A. Rodriguez. (Brooks, Kevin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Telephone Conference held on 8/28/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(dm)
August 28, 2019 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC for proceedings held on 08/27/2019.. (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2019 Filing 97 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Texas Industrial Energy Consumers, re #68 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Texas Industrial Energy Consumers (Coleman, Katherine)
August 27, 2019 Filing 96 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, re #89 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Motion to Dismiss and Proposed Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injuction filed by Movant Southwestern Public Service Company, #93 MOTION for Leave to File Texas Industrial Energy Consumers' Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Movant Texas Industrial Energy Consumers, #91 MOTION for Leave to File Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Movant Entergy Texas, Inc., #90 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC, #92 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss filed by Intervenor Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tillotson, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2019 Filing 95 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, DeAnn T. Walker, re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., Plaintiff NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, Plaintiff Lone Star Transmission, LLC, Plaintiff NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, Plaintiff NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Hulme, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, DeAnn T. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hulme, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to File Texas Industrial Energy Consumers' Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Texas Industrial Energy Consumers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order Order Denying, #4 Attachment A, #5 Attachment B, #6 Attachment C, #7 Attachment D, #8 Attachment E)(Coleman, Katherine)
August 23, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ex. A, #3 Proposed Order)(Brooks, Kevin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to File Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Proposed Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Proposed Order)(Garza, Catherine)
August 23, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opposition to Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ex. A, #3 Exhibit 2 to Ex. A, #4 Exhibit 3 to Ex. A, #5 Proposed Order)(Brooks, Kevin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Motion to Dismiss and Proposed Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injuction by Southwestern Public Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Price, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING #87 Motion for Jacob J. Lawler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark C. Davis Motion to for Pro Hac Vice Admission by Jacob J. Lawler ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12502463) by on behalf of East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice)(Davis, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING #73 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Winston P. Skinner. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 85 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, re #68 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Texas Industrial Energy Consumers (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tillotson, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING #78 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Ken Paxton (Attorney General of the State of Texas, in his official capacity). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katherine L. Coleman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC Amended Certificate of Service to #81 Reply to Response to Motion (Brooks, Kevin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC, re #49 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC (Brooks, Kevin)
August 20, 2019 Notice of Correction: Entergy Services, LLC. has been deleted. Originally added in error. (dm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 80 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #79 Opposed MOTION Partially Opposed Motion to Intervene (dm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 79 Opposed MOTION Partially Opposed Motion to Intervene by East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting ETEC's Motion to Intervene)(Davis, Mark)
August 19, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal/MOTION to Dismiss by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tillotson, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/19/2019 to create motion (dm).
August 16, 2019 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Entergy Texas, Inc. Amended/Revised #75 Reply to Response to Motion (Garza, Catherine)
August 16, 2019 Filing 76 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #75 Reply to Response to Motion (dm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Entergy Texas, Inc., re #50 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Entergy Texas, Inc. (Garza, Catherine)
August 15, 2019 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Southwestern Public Service Company, re #54 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Southwestern Public Service Company (Price, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin W. Brooks on behalf of Winston P. Skinner ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12480370) by on behalf of Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brooks, Kevin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC Amended/Revised #70 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 71 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #70 Response in Opposition to Motion. (dm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 70 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, re #54 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant SOUTHWESTERN PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY, #49 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC, #50 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Defendant Entergy Texas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tillotson, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael McMillin for Katherine L. Coleman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12472461) by on behalf of Texas Industrial Energy Consumers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McMillin, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Intervene and File Answer by Texas Industrial Energy Consumers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McMillin, Michael) Modified on 8/14/2019 to correct docket text (dm).
August 12, 2019 Filing 67 Pro Hac Vice Letter addressed to Winston P. Skinner regarding admission status. (dm)
August 12, 2019 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC for proceedings held on July 9, 2019. Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference. Court Reporter: Arlinda Rodriguez. (Brooks, Kevin)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark A. Walker. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew E. Price. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason Perkins. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Max Minzner. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tassity Johnson. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 9, 2019 Filing 60 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on July 9, 2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 8/30/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2019, (alr)
August 8, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James G. Ruiz Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Mark A. Walker) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12455269) by on behalf of SOUTHWESTERN PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruiz, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James G. Ruiz Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Matthew E. Price) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12455233) by on behalf of SOUTHWESTERN PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruiz, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James G. Ruiz Motion for Admssion Pro Hac Vice (Jason Perkins) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12455207) by on behalf of SOUTHWESTERN PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruiz, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James G. Ruiz Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Max Minzner) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12455178) by on behalf of SOUTHWESTERN PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruiz, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James G. Ruiz Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Tassity Johnson) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12454906) by on behalf of SOUTHWESTERN PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruiz, James)
August 8, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION Southwestern Public Service Company's Partially Opposed Motion to Intervene re #1 Complaint, by SOUTHWESTERN PUBLIC SERVICE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ruiz, James)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Miguel Suazo. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Wajiha Rizvi. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to George Hoyt. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Intervene by Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Brooks, Kevin)
August 6, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Intervene by Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(dm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine Elise Garza ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12443256) by Miguel Suazo on behalf of Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garza, Catherine)
August 6, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine Elise Garza ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12443197) by Wajiha Rizvi on behalf of Entergy Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garza, Catherine)
August 6, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine Elise Garza ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12442427) by George Hoyt on behalf of Entergy Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garza, Catherine)
July 30, 2019 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST of Telephonic Hearing by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC for proceedings held on 07/09/2019.. (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
July 26, 2019 Filing 44 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Erin E. Murphy; Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 100036451. (dm)
July 26, 2019 Filing 43 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Paul D. Clement; Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 100036450. (dm)
July 26, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by LSP Transmission Holdings II, LLC., re #33 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant LSP Transmission Holdings II, LLC. (Young, Kenneth)
July 19, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC re #33 MOTION to Intervene (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2019 Filing 40 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, re #33 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant LSP Transmission Holdings II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Hulme, John)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erin E. Murphy. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul D. Clement. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 37 Pro Hac Vice Letter regarding admission status of Tabitha J. De Paulo. (dm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 36 Pro Hac Vice Letter regarding admission status as to Sarah E. Williams. (dm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erin E. Murphy as to LSP Transmission Holdings II, LLC.. (dm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul D. Clement as to LSP Transmission Holdings II, LLC.. (dm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Intervene by LSP Transmission Holdings II, LLC.. (dm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth A. Young on behalf of LSP Transmission Holdings II, LLC. (dm)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Shelly Botkin answer due 8/23/2019; Arthur C. D'Andrea answer due 8/23/2019; Ken Paxton answer due 8/23/2019; DeAnn T. Walker answer due 8/23/2019.; GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Setting Hearing on #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction :( Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel,). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, Ken Paxton, DeAnn T. Walker for proceedings held on 07/09/19. Proceedings Transcribed: Status Conference. Court Reporter: Arlinda Rodriguez. (Myers, H.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Status Conference held on 7/9/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(dm)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING telephone Conference set for 7/9/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (so)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, Ken Paxton, DeAnn T. Walker, re #19 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant DeAnn T. Walker, Defendant Arthur C. D'Andrea, Defendant Ken Paxton, Defendant Shelly Botkin (Hulme, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, re #19 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant DeAnn T. Walker, Defendant Arthur C. D'Andrea, Defendant Ken Paxton, Defendant Shelly Botkin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tillotson, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Carlos M. Sires to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Evan M. Ezray to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Stuart Harold Singer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #20 Response in Opposition to Motion. Proposed Orders are required when a response to a non-dispositive motion is filed. (lt)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, re #19 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant DeAnn T. Walker, Defendant Arthur C. D'Andrea, Defendant Ken Paxton, Defendant Shelly Botkin (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, Ken Paxton, DeAnn T. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Hulme, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Mark Tillotson for Carlos M. Sires ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12298600) by on behalf of Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sire Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Tillotson, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Mark Tillotson for Evan M. Ezray ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12298580) by on behalf of Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ezray Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Tillotson, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Mark Tillotson for Stuart Harold Singer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12298543) by on behalf of Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Singer Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Tillotson, Jeffrey)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by H. Carl Myers on behalf of Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, Ken Paxton, DeAnn T. Walker. Attorney H. Carl Myers added to party Shelly Botkin(pty:dft), Attorney H. Carl Myers added to party Arthur C. D'Andrea(pty:dft), Attorney H. Carl Myers added to party Ken Paxton(pty:dft), Attorney H. Carl Myers added to party DeAnn T. Walker(pty:dft) (Myers, H.)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John R. Hulme on behalf of Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, Ken Paxton, DeAnn T. Walker. Attorney John R. Hulme added to party Shelly Botkin(pty:dft), Attorney John R. Hulme added to party Arthur C. D'Andrea(pty:dft), Attorney John R. Hulme added to party Ken Paxton(pty:dft), Attorney John R. Hulme added to party DeAnn T. Walker(pty:dft) (Hulme, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC. Arthur C. D'Andrea served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC. Shelly Botkin served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC. DeAnn T. Walker served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, Lone Star Transmission, LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC. Ken Paxton served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Shelly Botkin, Arthur C. D'Andrea, Ken Paxton, DeAnn T. Walker. (cj)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Evan Ezray, Stuart H. Singer, and Carlos M. Sires for Plaintiffs NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc. et al re: non-admitted status. (cj)
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Lone Star Transmission LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Affidavit, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Affidavit, #12 Proposed Order)(Tillotson, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Challenge to Constitutionality of a State Statute by Lone Star Transmission LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lone Star Transmission LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Main Document 5 replaced and flattened on 6/18/2019) (cj).
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lone Star Transmission LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Main Document 4 replaced and flattened on 6/18/2019) (cj).
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lone Star Transmission LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Main Document 3 replaced and flattened on 6/18/2019) (cj).
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lone Star Transmission LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC. (Tillotson, Jeffrey) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 6/18/2019) (cj).
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12241748), filed by NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC, NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC, Lone Star Transmission LLC, NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tillotson, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc. et al v. Paxton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur C. D'Andrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Botkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Represented By: H. Carl Myers
Represented By: John R. Hulme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chairman DeAnn T. Walker
Represented By: H. Carl Myers
Represented By: John R. Hulme
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Soos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Shelly Botkin
Represented By: H. Carl Myers
Represented By: John R. Hulme
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Soos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Arthur C. D'Andrea
Represented By: H. Carl Myers
Represented By: John R. Hulme
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Soos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Tillotson
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Carlos M. Sires
Represented By: Evan M. Ezray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lone Star Transmission LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Tillotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NextEra Energy Transmission Midwest, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Tillotson
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Carlos M. Sires
Represented By: Evan M. Ezray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NextEra Energy Transmission Southwest, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Tillotson
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Carlos M. Sires
Represented By: Evan M. Ezray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NextEra Energy Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Tillotson
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Carlos M. Sires
Represented By: Evan M. Ezray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lone Star Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Tillotson
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Carlos M. Sires
Represented By: Evan M. Ezray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Entergy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Texas Industrial Energy Consumers
Represented By: Michael McMillin
Represented By: Katherine L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Entergy Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Elise Garza
Represented By: George Hoyt
Represented By: Michael A. Boldt
Represented By: Wajiha Rizvi
Represented By: Lino Mendiola, III
Represented By: Miguel Suazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Southwestern Public Service Company
Represented By: Matthew E. Price
Represented By: Ron H. Moss
Represented By: Jason Perkins
Represented By: Mark A. Walker
Represented By: Tassity Johnson
Represented By: Max Minzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LSP Transmission Holdings II, LLC.
Represented By: Anna Rotman
Represented By: Kenneth A. Young
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Erin E. Murphy
Represented By: Tabitha J. De Paulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Oncor Electric Delivery Company LLC
Represented By: Thomas S. Leatherbury
Represented By: Kevin W. Brooks
Represented By: John C. Wander
Represented By: Winston Patrick Michael Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa Wanat
Represented By: Mark C. Davis
Represented By: Jacob Lawler
Represented By: L. Bradley Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew C. Mandelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?