Carmel Capital, LLC v. Builders Homesite, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carmel Capital, LLC
Defendant: Builders Homesite, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00634
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Builders Homesite, Inc.. (cj)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Builders Homesite, Inc.. (Cavazos, Edward)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Edward A. Cavazos added to party Builders Homesite, Inc.(pty:dft) by Builders Homesite, Inc..(Cavazos, Edward)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmel Capital, LLC. Builders Homesite, Inc. served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Janik, Glenn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights mailed along with copy of Complaint. (dl)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Builders Homesite, Inc. (dl)
June 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carmel Capital, LLC. (dl)
June 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Carmel Capital, LLC. (Janik, Glenn)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Carmel Capital, LLC. (Janik, Glenn) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/20/2019 to flatten image) (dl).
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12256598), filed by Carmel Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Janik, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmel Capital, LLC v. Builders Homesite, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Builders Homesite, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Christopher Nash
Represented By: Edward A. Cavazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmel Capital, LLC
Represented By: Rajkumar Vinnakota
Represented By: Glenn Edward Janik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?