Stross v. HomeASAP LLC
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross and Alexander Bayonne Stross
Defendant: HomeASAP LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00636
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason P. Grier. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katrina M. Quicker. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James Eldon Phillips for Applicant, Jason P. Grier ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12414840) by on behalf of HomeASAP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, James)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James Eldon Phillips for Applicant, Katrina M. Quicker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12414802) by on behalf of HomeASAP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, James)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HomeASAP LLC.(Phillips, James)
July 16, 2019 Reset Deadlines: HomeASAP LLC answer due 7/30/2019. (dm)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. HomeASAP LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before July 30, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint by HomeASAP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to HomeASAP LLC. (cj)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj)
June 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alexander Bayonne Stross. (cj)
June 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Alexander Stross. (McKinney, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/21/2019 to flatten image) (dl).
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12257973), filed by Alexander Stross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKinney, Robert) (Attachment 2 replaced and flattened on 6/21/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stross v. HomeASAP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Represented By: Robert Buckner McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Bayonne Stross
Represented By: Robert Buckner McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeASAP LLC
Represented By: Katrina M. Quicker
Represented By: Jason P. Grier
Represented By: James Eldon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?