Medrano v. Texas Facilities Commission
Plaintiff: Orlando Medrano
Defendant: Texas Facilities Commission
Case Number: 1:2019cv00643
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Texas Facilities Commission.(Marion, Natalee)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Texas Facilities Commission answer due 7/23/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Texas Facilities Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint)(Marion, Natalee)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orlando Medrano. Texas Facilities Commission served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Notzon, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Texas Facilities Commission. (dl)
June 24, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Orlando Medrano. (dl)
June 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Orlando Medrano. (Notzon, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/25/2019 to flatten image) (dl).
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12269955), filed by Orlando Medrano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Notzon, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medrano v. Texas Facilities Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Medrano
Represented By: Robert Stephen Notzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Facilities Commission
Represented By: Natalee B. Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?