Beau Burkett Media, LP v. City of Liberty Hill, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Beau Burkett Media, LP
Defendant: City of Liberty Hill, Texas and Liberty Hill Board of Adjustment
Case Number: 1:2019cv00644
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Concerning Reference to United States Magistrate Judge by Beau Burkett Media, LP (Rothfelder, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Concering Reference to Magistrate by City of Liberty Hill, Texas, Liberty Hill Board of Adjustment (McKamie, William)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher John. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher W. Rothfelder. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher John ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12276000) by on behalf of City of Liberty Hill, Texas, Liberty Hill Board of Adjustment. (Quast, Fredrick) (Main Document 7 replaced and flattened on 6/25/2019) (cj).
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Proof of Notice and Filing of Removal by City of Liberty Hill, Texas, Liberty Hill Board of Adjustment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McKamie, William)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher W. Rothfelder ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12274915) by on behalf of Beau Burkett Media, LP. (Rothfelder, Richard)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Directing Christopher John to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Directing Christopher W. Rothfelder to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
June 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Hill Board of Adjustment, City of Liberty Hill, Texas (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12270588), filed by Liberty Hill Board of Adjustment, City of Liberty Hill, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Register of Actions, #3 Defendants' Original Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(McKamie, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beau Burkett Media, LP v. City of Liberty Hill, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Liberty Hill, Texas
Represented By: William M. McKamie
Represented By: Christopher John
Represented By: Fredrick Fritz Quast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Hill Board of Adjustment
Represented By: William M. McKamie
Represented By: Christopher John
Represented By: Fredrick Fritz Quast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beau Burkett Media, LP
Represented By: Christopher W. Rothfelder
Represented By: Richard L. Rothfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?