Kidwell v. Laboratory Tops, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Kidwell
Defendant: Wilsonart LLC and Laboratory Tops, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00652
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Kelley Edwards added to party Laboratory Tops, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley Edwards added to party Wilsonart LLC(pty:dft) by Laboratory Tops, Inc., Wilsonart LLC.(Edwards, Kelley)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Kidwell. Laboratory Tops, Inc. served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Simon, Kell)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Kidwell. Wilsonart LLC served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Simon, Kell)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Laboratory Tops, Inc., Wilsonart LLC. (cj)
June 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jerry Kidwell. (cj)
June 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by JERRY KIDWELL. (Simon, Kell)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12279445), filed by JERRY KIDWELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simon, Kell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kidwell v. Laboratory Tops, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilsonart LLC
Represented By: Kelley Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Tops, Inc.
Represented By: Kelley Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Kidwell
Represented By: Kell Ascher Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?