Lucio Development LLC v. Nuvoton Technology Corporation America

Plaintiff: Lucio Development LLC
Defendant: Nuvoton Technology Corporation America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00662
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Stay All Deadlines Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Lucio Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint ; Nuvoton Technology Corporation America answer due 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Lucio Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucio Development LLC. Nuvoton Technology Corporation America served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Johnson, Jay)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with copy of Complaint. (dl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nuvoton Technology Corporation America. (dl)
June 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lucio Development LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12290146), filed by Lucio Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucio Development LLC v. Nuvoton Technology Corporation America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuvoton Technology Corporation America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucio Development LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Represented By: D. Bradley Kizzia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?