C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. v. Centex Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Defendant: Centex Produce, Inc., Montana Macias, Atticus Macias and Yves Macias
Case Number: 1:2019cv00672
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. Montana Macias served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Kyser, Eric)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. Atticus Macias served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Kyser, Eric)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. Centex Produce, Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Kyser, Eric)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Vacation by Centex Produce, Inc., Atticus Macias, Montana Macias, Yves Macias (de la Garza, Aaron)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Centex Produce, Inc.. (de la Garza, Aaron)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Aaron Charles de la Garza added to party Centex Produce, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Charles de la Garza added to party Atticus Macias(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Charles de la Garza added to party Montana Macias(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Charles de la Garza added to party Yves Macias(pty:dft) by Centex Produce, Inc., Atticus Macias, Montana Macias, Yves Macias.(de la Garza, Aaron)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric M. Kyser. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Centex Produce, Inc., Atticus Macias, Montana Macias, Yves Macias. (dl)
July 1, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
July 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. (dl)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100036275) by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order), #2 Receipt) (dl).
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 100036275), filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(dl) #5 Receipt) (dl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. v. Centex Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Charles de la Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Macias
Represented By: Aaron Charles de la Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atticus Macias
Represented By: Aaron Charles de la Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yves Macias
Represented By: Aaron Charles de la Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Michael Kyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?