Seneca Specialty Insurance Company v. CG&W Construction Solutions, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Seneca Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: CG&W Construction Solutions, LLC, Terry Kelley and CG&W Material Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00677
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Terry Kelley. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (td)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Seneca Specialty Insurance Company, re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Terry Kelley (Garcia, Rodrigo)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties (Corporate Disclosure Statement) by Seneca Specialty Insurance Company. (Garcia, Rodrigo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Terry Kelley. (Hilliard, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CG&W Construction Solutions, LLC, CG&W Material Solutions, LLC, Terry Kelley. (cj)
July 2, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Seneca Specialty Insurance Company. (cj)
July 2, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
July 2, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Seneca Specialty Insurance Company. Terry Kelley (Martin, Brian) (Main Document 4 replaced and flattened on 7/3/2019) (cj).
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Seneca Specialty Insurance Company. CG&W Materials Solutions (Martin, Brian) (Main Document 3 replaced and flattened on 7/3/2019) (cj).
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Seneca Specialty Insurance Company. CG&W Construction Solutions (Martin, Brian) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 7/3/2019) (cj).
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12307675), filed by Seneca Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - CG&W Construction, #3 Summons - CG&W Materials, #4 Summons - Terry Kelley)(Martin, Brian) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 7/3/2019) (cj). (Attachment 2 replaced and flattened on 7/3/2019) (cj). (Attachment 3 replaced and flattened on 7/3/2019) (cj). (Attachment 4 replaced and flattened on 7/3/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seneca Specialty Insurance Company v. CG&W Construction Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CG&W Construction Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Kelley
Represented By: Marion M. Reilly
Represented By: Jessica J. Pritchett
Represented By: John B. Martinez
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CG&W Material Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian S. Martin
Represented By: Rodrigo Diego Garcia, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?