McNeal v. Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Chatonya McNeal
Defendant: Greg Rasbeary, Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Kyle Bushn
Case Number: 1:2019cv00678
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Initial Disclosures by Chatonya McNeal (Peveto, Tara)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Scheduling Order by Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Salinas, Joanna)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company, re #6 MOTION to Abstain and Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Chatonya McNeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Election)(Salinas, Joanna) Modified on 8/9/2019 (td).
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Abstain and Remand to State Court by Chatonya McNeal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order P's PROPOSED ORDER, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B)(Wilson, Chad) Modified on 8/9/2019 (td).
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties by Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Salinas, Joanna)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties by Chatonya McNeal. (Wilson, Chad)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Supplement Record State Court by Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Greg Rasbeary re #2 Order (Salinas, Joanna)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
July 3, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Chatonya McNeal. (cj)
July 3, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
July 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Greg Rasbeary (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12310850), filed by Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Greg Rasbeary. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement JS44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Salinas, Joanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Rasbeary
Represented By: Joanna Lippman Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amica Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Joanna Lippman Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Bushn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chatonya McNeal
Represented By: Chad Troy Wilson
Represented By: Tara L. Peveto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?