Ou v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lisa Ou
Defendant: Valdez Trevino and Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00689
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Complainant's Initial Disclosures by Lisa Ou (MacIver, Amber)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING Initial Pretrial Conference by phone for 9/10/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (lt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Lisa Ou. (lt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Scheduling Order by Lisa Ou. (MacIver, Amber)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Lisa Ou. (MacIver, Amber)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Hearing re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal under Rule 12(b)(6), #8 Reply to Response to Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition by Lisa Ou. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MacIver, Amber)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, re #7 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Lisa Ou (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Baker, Brittany)
July 26, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #7 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss . The filed document is titled Plaintiff's Response to Allstate Fire and Casualty's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Filer selected wrong event; correction has been made. No further action is required. (lt)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order)(MacIver, Amber) Modified on 7/26/2019 to correct docket text and create docket relationship(lt).
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal under Rule 12(b)(6) by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Brittany)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Supplement State Court Docket Sheet)(Baker, Brittany)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #3 Supplement (lt)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Baker, Brittany)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
July 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lisa Ou. (cj)
July 8, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
July 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Valdez Trevino (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12318831), filed by Valdez Trevino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Baker, Brittany) (Attachment 2 replaced and flattened on 7/9/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ou v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valdez Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brittany Marie Baker
Represented By: Robert E. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ou
Represented By: Blake C. Erskine, Jr.
Represented By: Amber MacIver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?