Pegues v. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers et al
Plaintiff: Jairus Pegues
Defendant: Jerome Pelitera and International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Case Number: 1:2019cv00705
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Jerome Pelitera, re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Jairus Pegues (Roma, Elizabeth)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jairus Pegues. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(McClellan, Bradley)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Amended Certificate of Service by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Jerome Pelitera (Grunert, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Adding Certificate of Service by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Jerome Pelitera. (Quinto-Pozos, Manuel) Modified on 7/23/2019 to correct text (dm).
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Jerome Pelitera. (Quinto-Pozos, Manuel)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John J. Grunert. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Elizabeth A. Roma. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 State Court Records Filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court records)(Quinto-Pozos, Manuel)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Orders Directing John J. Grunert, Bradley Dean McClellanand Elizabeth A. Roma to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
July 15, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jairus Pegues. (cj)
July 15, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
July 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Manuel Alfonso Quinto-Pozos for attorney John J. Grunert ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12346965) by on behalf of International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Jerome Pelitera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to PHV Applic, #2 Proposed Order)(Quinto-Pozos, Manuel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Manuel Alfonso Quinto-Pozos for attorney Elizabeth A. Roma ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12346952) by on behalf of International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Jerome Pelitera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit in support of PHV Applic, #2 Proposed Order)(Quinto-Pozos, Manuel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Manuel Alfonso Quinto-Pozos on behalf of International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Jerome Pelitera (Quinto-Pozos, Manuel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to JS44 Civil Cover Sheet by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Jerome Pelitera. (Quinto-Pozos, Manuel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jerome Pelitera, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12345256), filed by Jerome Pelitera, International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Appendix and all Exhibits)(Quinto-Pozos, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pegues v. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Pelitera
Represented By: Manuel Alfonso Quinto-Pozos
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert
Represented By: Martha Powell Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers
Represented By: Manuel Alfonso Quinto-Pozos
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Roma
Represented By: John J. Grunert
Represented By: Martha Powell Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jairus Pegues
Represented By: Bradley Dean McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?