Beard v. Austin Transitional Center et al
Plaintiff: Travis Ronald Beard, II
Defendant: Austin Transitional Center, East Texas Multi-Use Treatment Fac and Parole Officer Ray Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2019cv00710
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew W Austin
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Travis Ronald Beard, II. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter and envelope). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (lt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Case Transfer and Opening Letter mailed to Travis Ronald Beard, II. (cj)
July 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin.. Referral Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (cj)
July 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from Eastern District of Texas; Case Number 6:19-cv-00313.
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF PARTIAL SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER severing Plaintiffs claims against the Austin Transitional Center and Ray Rodriguez and transferring them forthwith to the Western District of Texas, Austin Division. The claims against the East Texas Multi-Use Facility will remain in the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/15/2019. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
July 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **CONSENT FORM MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.** (ksd ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (ksd) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Travis Ronald Beard, II. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Financial Statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ksd) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Travis Ronald Beard, II. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Slip with Acct Balance)(ksd) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/16/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Travis Ronald Beard, II. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Claim, #2 Supplement Cover Letters, #3 Envelope(s))(ksd ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 7/16/2019.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beard v. Austin Transitional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Transitional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Texas Multi-Use Treatment Fac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parole Officer Ray Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Ronald Beard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?