Sync Financial, LLC v. Exebridge, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sync Financial, LLC
Defendant: Exebridge, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00711
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Dismissal by Sync Financial, LLC (O'Boyle, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Expedite Discovery and Setting of Temporary Injunction Hearing for August 16, 2019 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (so)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Pretrial Order Granting Request for Expedited Discovery and Setting Hearing by Sync Financial, LLC. (O'Boyle, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cleveland Roswell Burke on behalf of Exebridge, Inc.. Attorney Cleveland Roswell Burke added to party Exebridge, Inc.(pty:dft) (Burke, Cleveland)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Telephone Conference held on 7/31/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(so)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Pretrial Order on Request for Expedited Discovery by Sync Financial, LLC. (O'Boyle, Robert)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #5 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Discovery by Robert M. O'Boyle on behalf of Sync Financial, LLC (O'Boyle, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Telephone Conference In Chambers held on 7/24/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(afd)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sync Financial, LLC. Exebridge, Inc. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (O'Boyle, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF regarding #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Sync Financial, LLC. (O'Boyle, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Motion Hearing held on 7/19/2019 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Sync Financial, LLC (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(afd)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, ( Telephone Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Robert Pitman,). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite , MOTION for Discovery by Sync Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(O'Boyle, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Exebridge, Inc.. (dl)
July 16, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
July 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Sync Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(O'Boyle, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sync Financial, LLC. (O'Boyle, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/17/2019 to flatten image) (dl).
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12354630), filed by Sync Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Boyle, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sync Financial, LLC v. Exebridge, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exebridge, Inc.
Represented By: Cleveland Roswell Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sync Financial, LLC
Represented By: Robert M. O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?