Lasseter v. Ace American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Benjamin Lasseter
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00731
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant Ace American Insurance Comopany's ANSWER to Complaint by Ace American Insurance Company.(Armstrong, Casey)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge by Ace American Insurance Company (Zeger, Allison)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Casey Armstrong. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert M. Browning. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tommy D. Sheen. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John F. Rabe, Jr.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allison Anne Zeger Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Casey Armstrong ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12437054) by on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Casey Armstrong)(Zeger, Allison)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allison Anne Zeger Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert M. Browning ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12436987) by on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Zeger, Allison)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brad J. Davidson (for Attorney John F. Rabe, Jr.) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12407368) by on behalf of Benjamin Lasseter. (Davidson, Brad)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brad J. Davidson (for Attorney Tommy D. Sheen) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12407332) by on behalf of Benjamin Lasseter. (Davidson, Brad)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brad J. Davidson on behalf of Benjamin Lasseter. Attorney Brad J. Davidson added to party Benjamin Lasseter(pty:pla) (Davidson, Brad)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Orders Directing Casey A. Armstrong, Robert M. Browning, John F. Rabe, and Tommy D. Sheen to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
July 22, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ace American Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12374137), filed by Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplmental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A- Index, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B- Docket Report, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C-1- Citation, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C-2- Plaintiff's Original Petition, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C-3- Def. Original Answer, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D- Certificate of Interested Parties, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E- Policy)(Zeger, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lasseter v. Ace American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Lasseter
Represented By: John F. Rabe
Represented By: Tommy D. Sheen
Represented By: John F. Rabe, Jr
Represented By: Brad J. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Allison Anne Zeger
Represented By: Robert M. Browning
Represented By: Casey A. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?