United States of America v. Ratcliffe
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Janice Ratcliffe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00733
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane: Hearing for failure to appear at Show Cause Hearing held on 8/23/2019. Written Order setting conditions of release entered at #7 . (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter ERO.)(lt)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Janice Ratcliffe. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (lt)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT returned executed as to Janice Ratcliffe. (lt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Warrant Issued as to Janice Ratcliffe. (lt)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR BENCH WARRANT for the arrest of the Respondent Janice Ratcliffe. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Show Cause Hearing held on 8/19/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(dm)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Janice Ratcliffe. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/19/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel,. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 22, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons (Filing fee $ 400 WAIVED.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Priver, Donald) (Attachment 5 replaced and flattened on 7/22/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ratcliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Donald Priver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janice Ratcliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?